This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:38:44 (UTC).

Allstate Indemnity Company et al v. Reeve et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2015 Allstate Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Reeve. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00937

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Defendants

King County

Molly Reeve

Counter Defendants

Allstate Property and Casualty Company

Allstate Indemnity Company

Counter Claimants

Wayne Ross

Susan Ross

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jessica Lynn Hardung Kozma

Attorney at KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

500 4Th Ave, Ste 900

Seattle, WA 98104-5039

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Douglas F Foley

Vernon Scott Finley

Counter Claimant Attorney

Patrick H LePley

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued as to defendants King County, Molly Reeve, Susan Ross, Wayne Ross. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(MKB) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Angel Allende, Legislative Secretary for King County on 6/24/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on A.J. Ross on behalf of Susan Ross on 6/25/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on A.J. Ross on behalf of Wayne Ross on 6/25/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica Lynn Hardung Kozma on behalf of Defendant King County. (Hardung Kozma, Jessica) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by King County.(Hardung Kozma, Jessica) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by defendant Wayne Ross as pro se. (PM) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick H LePley on behalf of Defendants Susan Ross, Wayne Ross. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company by Wayne Ross, Susan Ross.(LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/23/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/30/2015, Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#14

(#14) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel Shaun Huppert on Behalf of Defendant Molly Reeve and efiled on behalf of Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company on 08/17/2015. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#15

(#15) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5 days. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#17

(#17) DECLARATION of Douglas Foley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#18

(#18) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 10/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/14/2016, Discovery completed by 6/13/2016, Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2016, Motions in Limine due by 9/13/2016, Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2016, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 10/4/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#19

(#19) RESPONSE, by Defendants Susan Ross, Wayne Ross, Counter Claimants Susan Ross, Wayne Ross, to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE, by Defendants Susan Ross, Wayne Ross, Counter Claimants Susan Ross, Wayne Ross, to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 10/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/14/2016, Discovery completed by 6/13/2016, Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2016, Motions in Limine due by 9/13/2016, Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2016, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 10/4/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DECLARATION of Douglas Foley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/6/2015, (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5 days. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel Shaun Huppert on Behalf of Defendant Molly Reeve and efiled on behalf of Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company on 08/17/2015. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/23/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/30/2015, Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company by Wayne Ross, Susan Ross.(LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick H LePley on behalf of Defendants Susan Ross, Wayne Ross. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by defendant Wayne Ross as pro se. (PM) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by King County.(Hardung Kozma, Jessica) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica Lynn Hardung Kozma on behalf of Defendant King County. (Hardung Kozma, Jessica) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on A.J. Ross on behalf of Wayne Ross on 6/25/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on A.J. Ross on behalf of Susan Ross on 6/25/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Angel Allende, Legislative Secretary for King County on 6/24/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summonses Issued as to defendants King County, Molly Reeve, Susan Ross, Wayne Ross. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(MKB) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4051972), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less