This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:56:15 (UTC).

Allergan Sales, LLC v. Sandoz, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2015 Allergan Sales, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sandoz, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Allergan Sales, LLC

Allergan, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Sandoz, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Deanna Jean Reichel

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Minneapolis

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Juanita Rose Brooks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - San Diego

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Roger Alen Denning

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - San Diego

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Jonathan Elliot Singer

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Minneapolis

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gregory Phillip Love

Attorney at Love Law Firm PC

P.O. Box 948 (Henderson, Tx 75653), 107 East Main Street

Henderson, TX 75652

Susan M Coletti

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Wilmington

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P O Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Rachel Krevans

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP San Francisco

425 Market St, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Brian M Kramer

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster - San Diego

12531 High Bluff Dr, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

William Ellsworth Davis, III

Attorney at The Davis Firm, PC - Longview

213 North Fredonia Street, Suite 230

Longview, TX 75601

Not Classified By Court Attorney

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) NOTICE by Allergan Sales, LLC Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#44

(#44) ORDER granting 28 Motion for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidationto Enter Proposed Docket Control Order; granting 31 Motion for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidationto Enter Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Alen Denning on behalf of Allergan Sales, LLC (Denning, Roger) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allergan Sales, LLC (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#43

(#43) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED with the LEAD CASE, cause No. 2:12-cv-207. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#45

(#45) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motions Hearing held on 10/5/2015 re 31 Opposed MOTION Enter Proposed Docket Control Order filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, 28 Opposed MOTION for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidation with C.A. 2:12-cv-00207-JRG filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

#40

(#40) SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Opposed MOTION for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidation with C.A. 2:12-cv-00207-JRG filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Susan Coletti, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Coletti Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Coletti Declaration)(Coletti, Susan) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juanita Rose Brooks on behalf of Allergan Sales, LLC (Brooks, Juanita) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deanna Jean Reichel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan M Coletti on behalf of Allergan Sales, LLC (Coletti, Susan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#46

(#46) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2015., Discovery due by 5/20/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2015., Mediation Completion due by 5/30/2016., Markman Hearing set for 3/2/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2016.), ( Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2015., Discovery due by 5/20/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2015., Markman Hearing set for 3/2/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2016., Bench Trial set for 10/25/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/14/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#48

(#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/5/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#47

(#47) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/15 (Scheduling Conferece) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2016. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Sandoz, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sandoz, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5090766.), filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,030,149, # 2 Exhibit B - US 7,320,976, # 3 Exhibit C - US 7,642,258, # 4 Exhibit D - US 8,748,425, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#42

(#42) NOTICE by Allergan Sales, LLC of Disclosure of Updated Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Elliot Singer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/5/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/15 (Scheduling Conferece) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2016. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2015., Discovery due by 5/20/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2015., Mediation Completion due by 5/30/2016., Markman Hearing set for 3/2/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2016.), ( Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2015., Discovery due by 5/20/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2015., Markman Hearing set for 3/2/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2016., Bench Trial set for 10/25/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/14/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motions Hearing held on 10/5/2015 re 31 Opposed MOTION Enter Proposed Docket Control Order filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, 28 Opposed MOTION for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidation with C.A. 2:12-cv-00207-JRG filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER granting 28 Motion for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidationto Enter Proposed Docket Control Order; granting 31 Motion for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidationto Enter Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED with the LEAD CASE, cause No. 2:12-cv-207. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE by Allergan Sales, LLC of Disclosure of Updated Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE by Allergan Sales, LLC Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Opposed MOTION for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidation with C.A. 2:12-cv-00207-JRG filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Susan Coletti, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Coletti Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Coletti Declaration)(Coletti, Susan) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Opposed MOTION for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidation with C.A. 2:12-cv-00207-JRG - Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Earlier Trial Date in Light of Agreed Consolidation with C.A. 2:12-CV-00207-JRG filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Brian Kramer in Support of its Motion for Earlier Trial Date, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Email Exchange Between J. Roberts and S. Coletti, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Email from S. Coletti to Counsel)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allergan Sales, LLC. Sandoz, Inc. served on 3/17/2015, answer due 4/7/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Alen Denning on behalf of Allergan Sales, LLC (Denning, Roger) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juanita Rose Brooks on behalf of Allergan Sales, LLC (Brooks, Juanita) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan M Coletti on behalf of Allergan Sales, LLC (Coletti, Susan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Sandoz, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deanna Jean Reichel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Elliot Singer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allergan Sales, LLC (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sandoz, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5090766.), filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,030,149, # 2 Exhibit B - US 7,320,976, # 3 Exhibit C - US 7,642,258, # 4 Exhibit D - US 8,748,425, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.