This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 00:30:02 (UTC).

AlixPartners, LLP v. Brewington

Case Summary

On 12/30/2014 AlixPartners, LLP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Brewington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge David R. Grand and District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-14942

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David R. Grand

Judge

District Judge Gerald E. Rosen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AlixPartners, LLP

Defendant

Charles Brewington

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J. Debold

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn,

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Karl G. Nelson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn,

2100 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason C. Schwartz

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn,

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Defendant Attorney

Steven E. Aldous

Attorney at Forshey & Prostok LLP

500 Crescent Court, Suite 240

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4962828 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Collin. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Debold, David) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by AlixPartners, LLP (Debold, David) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Charles Brewington* (TMcg) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Karl G. Nelson on behalf of AlixPartners, LLP. (Nelson, Karl) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Schwartz on behalf of AlixPartners, LLP. (Schwartz, Jason) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Charles Brewington served on 1/7/2015, answer due 1/28/2015. (Nelson, Karl) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Charles Brewington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Brewington) (Aldous, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#8

(#8) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re 7 MOTION to Dismiss (JOwe) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AlixPartners, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Severson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Diefenbacher Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Kantor Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Gruber Declaration) (Debold, David) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Brewington. (Aldous, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment by AlixPartners, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Karl Nelson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Debold, David) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

#12

(#12) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JOwe) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Brewington. (Aldous, Steven) Modified on 4/13/2015 (DTyl) [OBJECTIONS AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT] (Entered: 04/10/2015)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AlixPartners, LLP. (Debold, David) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

#15

(#15) OPINION and ORDER DENYING Defendant's 7 Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (SBur) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#16

(#16) AMENDED 15 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's 7 Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint by Charles Brewington. (Aldous, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint by Charles Brewington. (Aldous, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED 15 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's 7 Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) OPINION and ORDER DENYING Defendant's 7 Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (SBur) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AlixPartners, LLP. (Debold, David) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Brewington. (Aldous, Steven) Modified on 4/13/2015 (DTyl) [OBJECTIONS AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT] (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JOwe) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment by AlixPartners, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Karl Nelson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Debold, David) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Brewington. (Aldous, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AlixPartners, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Severson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Diefenbacher Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Kantor Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Gruber Declaration) (Debold, David) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re 7 MOTION to Dismiss (JOwe) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Charles Brewington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Brewington) (Aldous, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Charles Brewington served on 1/7/2015, answer due 1/28/2015. (Nelson, Karl) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Schwartz on behalf of AlixPartners, LLP. (Schwartz, Jason) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Karl G. Nelson on behalf of AlixPartners, LLP. (Nelson, Karl) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Charles Brewington* (TMcg) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by AlixPartners, LLP (Debold, David) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4962828 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Collin. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Debold, David) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less