This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 20:48:55 (UTC).

Akina v. State of Hawaii

Case Summary

On 08/13/2015 Akina filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against State of Hawaii. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Judge

JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keli'i Akina

Kealii Makekau

Joseph Kent

Petitioners

Samuel L. Kealoha, Jr.

Melvin Hoomanawanui

Josiah L. Hoohuli

Defendants

Haunani Apoliona

State of Hawaii, The

John D. Waihe'e, IV

Lei Kihoi

Robin Danner

Leina'ala Ahu Isa

Robert K. Lindsey, Jr.

Akamai Foundation, The

Dan Ahuna

Carmen Hulu Lindsey

Na'alehu Anthony

John D. Waihe'e, III

Rowena M.N. Akana

Interested Party

Kingdom of Hawai'i

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Lilly

Attorney at Ning Lilly & Jones

707 Richards Street, Suite 700, 528-1100

Honolulu, HI 96813

H. Christopher Coates

Attorney at Law Office of H. Christopher Coates

934 Compass Point

Charleston, SC 29412

Lauren M. Burke

Attorney at Judicial Watch, Inc.

425 Third Street Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Chris Fedeli

Attorney at Judicial Watch, Inc.

425 Third Street Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Robert D. Popper

Attorney at Judicial Watch, Inc.

425 Third Street Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Petitioner Attorney

Walter R. Schoettle

P O Box 596, 537-3514, Fax: 924-1548

Honolulu, HI 96809

Defendant Attorneys

Kannon K. Shanmugam

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Ellen Oberwetter

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Eli Schlam

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Robert G. Klein

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Five Waterfront Plaza Ste 400, 500 Ala Moana Blvd, 529-7300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Robert T. Nakatsuji

Attorney at Department of the Attorney General-State of Hawaii

425 Queen St

Honolulu, HI 96813

Donna H. Kalama

Attorney at State of Hawaii

425 Queen Street, 587-2995, Fax: 587-2999

Honolulu, HI 96813

Girard D. Lau

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General-Hawaii

425 Queen St, 586-1500

Honolulu, HI 96813

William Meheula

Attorney at Sullivan Lee Meheula, LLLP

745 Fort Street, Suite 800

Honolulu, HI 96813

Nadine Y. Ando

Attorney at Sullivan Meheula Lee LLLP

745 Fort Street, Suite 800, 599-9555, Fax: 533-2467

Honolulu, HI 96813

Interested Party Attorney

Lanny Alan Sinkin

Po Box 944

Hilo, HI 96721

Other Attorneys

Jessica M. Wan

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon

Five Waterfront Plaza 4Th Floor, 500 Ala Moana Blvd

Honolulu, HI 96813

Troy J.H. Andrade

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon

Five Waterfront Plaza 4Th Floor, 500 Ala Moana Blvd, 529-7300

Honolulu, HI 96813

David J. Minkin

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon

Five Waterfront Plaza 4Th Floor, 500 Ala Moana Blvd, 529-7300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Thomas A. Helper

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

300 Ala Moana Blvd Ste 6100, 541-2850

Honolulu, HI 96850

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1592020.), filed by Kelii Akina.(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kelii Akina. (Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#3

(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 11/16/2015 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN.by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 08/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures)(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry ATTACH THIS SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THIS SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT. (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: # 1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit, # 2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eps) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Attachments: # 1 Election Form To Consent)(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THIS NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THIS NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 15-00322 BMK on all further filings. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re Robert D. Popper) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593927. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re Lauren M. Burke) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593947. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re: Chris Fedeli) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593951. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#93

(#93) Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Thomas A. Helper on behalf of United States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Compliance, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#92

(#92) REPLY re 91 Reply,, Certificate of Service filed by Keli'i Akina, Pedro Kana'e Gapero, Joseph Kent, Kealii Makekau, Yoshimasa Sean Mitsui, Melissa Leina'ala Moniz. (Popper, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#91

(#91) REPLY re 47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 80 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, 83 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, 79 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Keli'i Akina, Pedro Kana'e Gapero, Joseph Kent, Kealii Makekau, Yoshimasa Sean Mitsui, Melissa Leina'ala Moniz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kealii Makekau, # 2 Declaration of Keli'i Akina, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Declaration of Gail Heriot, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Certificate of Compliance with L.R. 7.5)(Popper, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#90

(#90) NOTICE by Kingdom of Hawai'i Absence of Indispensible Party Kingdom of Hawai'i. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Compliance, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Sinkin, Lanny) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#89

(#89) INVITATION TO THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/2/2015. (afc)Related: 84 Minute Order. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. The United States of Attorney for the District of Hawaii served electronically via NEF addressed to Thomas A. Helper, Esq., AUSA. (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#88

(#88) STATEMENT Letter re: ECF No. 84 filed by Keli'i Akina, Pedro Kana'e Gapero, Joseph Kent, Kealii Makekau, Yoshimasa Sean Mitsui, Melissa Leina'ala Moniz. (Popper, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#87

(#87) RESPONSE re 84 Link, filed by Virgil E. Day, Josiah L. Hoohuli, Melvin Hoomanawanui, Patrick L. Kahawaiolaa, Samuel L. Kealoha, Jr.. (Schoettle, Walter) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#86

(#86) STATEMENT Letter Re Dkt No. 84 filed by Na'alehu Anthony, Robin Danner, David Y. Ige, Lei Kihoi, Clyde W. Namu'o, State of Hawaii, The, John D. Waihe'e, III, Mahealani Wendt. (Kalama, Donna) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#85

(#85) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELI SCHLAM re: 78 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 10/01/2015. (afc) ELI SCHLAM, ESQ. (Williams & Connolly LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for defendants: Robert K. Lindsey, Jr. Chairperson, Board of Trustees, Office of Hawaiian Affairs ("OHA"), and OHA TRUSTEES: Leina'ala Ahu IsaDan Ahuna Rowena M.N. AkanaPeter ApoHaunani ApolionaKamana'opono CrabbeCarmen Hulu LindseyColette Y. Machado John D. Waihe'e, IV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. (Entered: 10/01/2015)

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Thomas A. Helper on behalf of United States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Compliance, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) REPLY re 91 Reply,, Certificate of Service filed by Keli'i Akina, Pedro Kana'e Gapero, Joseph Kent, Kealii Makekau, Yoshimasa Sean Mitsui, Melissa Leina'ala Moniz. (Popper, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) REPLY re 47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 80 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, 83 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, 79 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Keli'i Akina, Pedro Kana'e Gapero, Joseph Kent, Kealii Makekau, Yoshimasa Sean Mitsui, Melissa Leina'ala Moniz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kealii Makekau, # 2 Declaration of Keli'i Akina, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Declaration of Gail Heriot, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Certificate of Compliance with L.R. 7.5)(Popper, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) NOTICE by Kingdom of Hawai'i Absence of Indispensible Party Kingdom of Hawai'i. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Compliance, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Sinkin, Lanny) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) INVITATION TO THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/2/2015. (afc)Related: 84 Minute Order. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. The United States of Attorney for the District of Hawaii served electronically via NEF addressed to Thomas A. Helper, Esq., AUSA. (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) STATEMENT Letter re: ECF No. 84 filed by Keli'i Akina, Pedro Kana'e Gapero, Joseph Kent, Kealii Makekau, Yoshimasa Sean Mitsui, Melissa Leina'ala Moniz. (Popper, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) RESPONSE re 84 Link, filed by Virgil E. Day, Josiah L. Hoohuli, Melvin Hoomanawanui, Patrick L. Kahawaiolaa, Samuel L. Kealoha, Jr.. (Schoettle, Walter) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) STATEMENT Letter Re Dkt No. 84 filed by Na'alehu Anthony, Robin Danner, David Y. Ige, Lei Kihoi, Clyde W. Namu'o, State of Hawaii, The, John D. Waihe'e, III, Mahealani Wendt. (Kalama, Donna) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELI SCHLAM re: 78 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 10/01/2015. (afc) ELI SCHLAM, ESQ. (Williams & Connolly LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for defendants: Robert K. Lindsey, Jr. Chairperson, Board of Trustees, Office of Hawaiian Affairs ("OHA"), and OHA TRUSTEES: Leina'ala Ahu IsaDan Ahuna Rowena M.N. AkanaPeter ApoHaunani ApolionaKamana'opono CrabbeCarmen Hulu LindseyColette Y. Machado John D. Waihe'e, IV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) EO: On September 29, 2015, the United States Department of the Interior published a Notice of Proposed Rulemaking ("NPRM") soliciting comments on "Procedures for Reestablishing a Formal Government-to-Government Relationship with the Native Hawaiian Community." Given this timing, and certain references to this NPRM in Defendants' briefing, see, e.g., Doc. No. 83, OHA Defs.' Br. at 11 n.2, the court is considering (sua sponte) whether to invite the Department of Interior to file an amicus brief regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Before doing so, however, the court seeks input from the parties as to the appropriateness of such action. The parties may file a letter (limited to 2 pages) before noon, October 2, 2015. The court will then determine whether to invite an amicus brief from the Department of the Interior. (JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(shm, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re: H. Christopher Coates) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593956. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re: Chris Fedeli) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593951. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re Lauren M. Burke) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593947. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (re Robert D. Popper) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1593927. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 15-00322 BMK on all further filings. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Attachments: # 1 Election Form To Consent)(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THIS NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THIS NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: # 1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit, # 2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eps) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 11/16/2015 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN.by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 08/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures)(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry ATTACH THIS SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THIS SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT. (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kelii Akina. (Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1592020.), filed by Kelii Akina.(Lilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.