This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:29:52 (UTC).

Agrocooperative Ltd. v. Sonangol Shipping Angola (Luanda) Limitada et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Agrocooperative Ltd filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Sonangol Shipping Angola Luanda Limitada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Sim Lake and Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-01707

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Sim Lake

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD.

Defendants

SONANGOL SHIPPING ANGOLA (LUANDA) LIMITADA

SONANGOL E.P.

Garnishees

Sonangol Hidrocarbonetos USA Ltd.

Sonangol Marine Services Inc.

SONANGOL OFFSHORE SERVICES COMPANY

Sonangol Gas Natural Company

Stena Sonangol

SONANGOL INTERNATIONAL PROCUREMENT INC.

Sonangol U.S.A. Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Patrick Walters

Attorney at Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.

801 Travis St., Suite 1910

Houston, TX 77002

J Stephen Simms

Attorney at Simms Showers LLP

201 International Circle, Ste 702

Baltimore, MD 21030

Marios J. Monopolis

Attorney at Simms Showers LLP

201 International Circle, Suite 250

Hunt Valley, MA 21030

Garnishee and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Alvin Key

Attorney at Dugger and Associates

1401 Enclave Parkway, Ste 125

Houston, TX 77077

Christopher Roland Hart

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime Garnishment by AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walters, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/31/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Order of Issuance of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2014: # 2 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment) (aboyd, 4). (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint for Service of Process. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Simms, J) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Marios J. Monopolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

#44

(#44) MEMORANDUM, RECOMMENDATION, AND ORDER re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Forum Non Conveniens, and Insufficient Process, 30 MOTION to Vacate, 39 MOTION to Compel Garnishees' Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories Objections to M&R due by 12/29/2014(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#45

(#45) Amended PROPOSED ORDER for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment re: 14 Supplement,, filed.(Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#46

(#46) ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 44 Memorandum and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Compel, denying 30 MOTION to Vacate, denying 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Forum Non Conveniens, and Insufficient Process. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

#47

(#47) AMENDED ORDER for Issuance of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

#48

(#48) MOTION Issuance of Supplemental Process of Maritime Attachment and GarnishmentMotions referred to Nancy K. Johnson. by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Process of Maritime Attachment - DSME)(Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#49

(#49) NOTICE Line Withdrawing Request for Issuance of Supplemental Writ re: 48 MOTION Issuance of Supplemental Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. (Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#50

(#50) SECOND AMENDED ORDER for Issuance of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#52

(#52) ORDER: re 51 Motion for Writ of Garnishment.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER: re 51 Motion for Writ of Garnishment.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) MOTION for Issuance of Supplemental Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Motions referred to Nancy K. Johnson. by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum to Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - DSME)(Monopolis, Marios) Modified on 1/14/2015 (ltien, 4). (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) SECOND AMENDED ORDER for Issuance of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) NOTICE Line Withdrawing Request for Issuance of Supplemental Writ re: 48 MOTION Issuance of Supplemental Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. (Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MOTION Issuance of Supplemental Process of Maritime Attachment and GarnishmentMotions referred to Nancy K. Johnson. by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Process of Maritime Attachment - DSME)(Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AMENDED ORDER for Issuance of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 44 Memorandum and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Compel, denying 30 MOTION to Vacate, denying 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Forum Non Conveniens, and Insufficient Process. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Amended PROPOSED ORDER for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment re: 14 Supplement,, filed.(Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MEMORANDUM, RECOMMENDATION, AND ORDER re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Forum Non Conveniens, and Insufficient Process, 30 MOTION to Vacate, 39 MOTION to Compel Garnishees' Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories Objections to M&R due by 12/29/2014(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE to 39 MOTION to Compel Garnishees' Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories , filed by Sonangol Gas Natural Company, Sonangol Hidrocarbonetos USA Ltd., Sonangol International Procurement Inc., Sonangol Marine Services Inc., Sonangol Offshore Services Company, Sonangol U.S.A. Company, Stena Sonangol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Key, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Marios J. Monopolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Marios J. Monopolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Agrocooperative Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Monopolis, Marios) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Simms, J) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint for Service of Process. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Order of Issuance of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2014: # 2 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment) (aboyd, 4). (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/31/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime Garnishment by AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walters, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - Sonangol Shipping, # 3 Exhibit Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - Sonangol Offshore, # 4 Exhibit Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - Sonangol International, # 5 Proposed Order Directing the Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment)(Walters, Kevin) Modified on 6/20/2014 (aboyd, 4). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SONANGOL INTERNATIONAL PROCUREMENT INC., SONANGOL OFFSHORE SERVICES COMPANY, SONANGOL SHIPPING ANGOLA (LUANDA) LIMITADA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13309247) filed by AGROCOOPERATIVE LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule B Affidavit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walters, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.