This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:41:45 (UTC).

AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Pfizer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00394

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller

Judge

District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund

Defendants

Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.

Pfizer, Inc.

G.D. Searle, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Buckley Warden, IV

Attorney at DurretteCrump PLC

1111 East Main Street, 16Th Floor

Richmond, VA 23219

Jeffrey Louis Kodroff

Attorney at Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis PC

1818 Market St, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John Angelo Macoretta

Attorney at Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis PC

1818 Market St, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.

Attorney at DurretteCrump PLC

1111 East Main Street, 16Th Floor

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

Jaime Manuel Crowe

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005-3807

Brendan Woodard

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Bryan Gant

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Raj Gandesha

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Robert Alexander Milne

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Ryan Johnson

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Sheryn George

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

#31

#32

#33

#34

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER in case 2:14-cv-00361-AWA-DEM; granting (24), the unopposed Motion in case 2:14-cv-00395-AWA-LRL, as follows: 1. End-Payor Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated, Amended Complaint by January 14, 2015; and 2. Defendants agree to accept service of the consolidated Amended Complaint and are granted until March 2, 2015 to answer, plead, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint; Defendants are permitted to file one comprehensive motion to dismiss addressing all grounds for dismissal; the memorandum in support shall not exceed 55 pages; 3. End-Payor Plaintiffs shall file a comprehensive opposition brief to a motion to dismiss filed by Defendants no later than March 30, 2015; the brief in opposition shall not exceed 45 pages; 4. Defendants shall file a reply brief in support of a motion to dismiss not exceeding 35 pages on or before April 20, 2015. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 1/16/2015. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00395-AWA-LRL, 2:14-cv-00361-AWA-DEM, 2:14-cv-00369-AWA-LRL, 2:14-cv-00394-AWA-DEM, 2:14-cv-00418-AWA-LRL, 2:14-cv-00442-AWA-TEM, 2:14-cv-00452-AWA-LRL, 2:14-cv-00462-AWA-TEM, 2:14-cv-00464-AWA-LRL(Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases - Lead case is 2:14cv395. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/23/14. (afar) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Memorandum in Support re 31 Supplemental MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Supplemental & Joint) filed by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 11/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Supplemental MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Supplemental & Joint) by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order)(Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 11/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Memorandum in Support re 29 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting 27 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Raj Gandesha as certified by Local Counsel Jaime Manuel Crowe for Defendants G.D. Searle, LLC, Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., and Pfizer, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/08/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Raj Gandesha and Certification of Local Counsel Jaime Manuel Crowe Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4101001. by G.D. Searle, LLC, Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Pfizer, Inc.. (Crowe, Jaime) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting 21 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheryn Alexander as certified by Local Counsel Jaime Manuel for Defendants G.D. Searle, LLC, Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., and Pfizer, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/2/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting 20 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Johnson as certified by Local Counsel Jaime Manuel Crowe for Defendants G.D. Searle, LLC, Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., and Pfizer, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/02/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed. G.D. Searle, LLC served on 7/25/2014, answer due 8/15/2014; Pfizer, Inc. served on 7/25/2014, answer due 8/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(tdai, ) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to G.D. Searle, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. Process includes summons and copy of 1 Complaint. Summons mailed by FedEx Express to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (tdai, ) (Entered: 07/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Memorandum in Support re 7 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed John Angelo Macoretta for AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 7/16/14. (tdai, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Jeffrey Louis Kodroff for AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 7/16/14. (tdai, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Angelo Macoretta and Certification of Local Counsel Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4036722. by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Louis Kodroff and Certification of Local Counsel Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4036702. by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Durrette, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against G.D. Searle, LLC, Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Pfizer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 34683025796.), filed by AFSCME Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt, # 3 Cover Letter)(tdai, ) (Entered: 07/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.D. Searle LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey L. Kodroff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Macoretta