This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2016 at 04:15:20 (UTC).

Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2014 Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-02717

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC

Defendants

LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc.

BlackBerry Corporation

HTC America, Inc.

Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC

High Tech Computer Corp.

LG Electronics USA, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Counter Claimant

LG Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Greer Henry

Attorney at Looper Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1601 Elm St., Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Lawrence Louis Germer

Attorney at Germer Gertz

550 Fannin Street, Suite 400

Beaumont, TX 77701

Russell Erin Jumper

Attorney at Gray Reed, & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Sharon E. Roberg-Perez

Attorney at Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi L.L.P.

2800 Lasalle Plaza, 800 Lasalle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Shira T. Shapiro

Attorney at Robins, Kaplan, Miller and Ciresi L.L.P.

800 Lasalle Avenue, 2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Wesley Wei-Liang Lew

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

Defendant Attorneys

Lily Lim

E. Leon Carter

Attorney at Carter Scholer Arnett Hamada & Mockler, PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, 5Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Henry Blake Wong

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 3900

Houston, TX 77002-5005

Jon Stuart Dean

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3218

Sarah Chapin Columbia

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

28 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Tala Katherine Toufanian

Attorney at McDermott, Will and Emery, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3218

Jerry Robin Selinger

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

1700 Pacific Ave., Suite 2650

Dallas, TX 75201

Susan Elizabeth Powley

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan LLP - Dallas

1700 Pacific, Suite 2650

Dallas, TX 75201

Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Jesse J Jenner

Attorney at Ropes and Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-8704

Julian Desmond Moore

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1211 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Stephen J. Rosenman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

700 12Th Street Northwest, One Metro Center

Washington, DC 20005-3948

Brian Paul Biddinger

Attorney at Fish & Neave

525 University Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Counter Claimant Attorney

John M. Mulcahy

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#99

#100

#101

#102

#103

#104

#105

#106

#107

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Wesley Wei-Liang Lew re Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/4/2016) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jon Stuart Dean (Dean, Jon) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) CLERK'S NOTICE In light of the parties' joint status report (Dkt. No. 104) in 14-cv-2717-YGR and (Dkt. no.104) in 14-cv-3030-YGR and (Dkt. No. 130) in 14-cv-3031-YGR; the Compliance Hearing set for Friday, November 6, 2015 is CONTINUED to Friday, May 6, 2016 at 9:01 a.m. A further status report is due by April 29, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) JOINT STATUS REPORT JOINT by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 10/30/2015) Modified on 11/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins re Withdrawal of Stephen J. Rosenman (Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) UNSEALING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/28/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) JOINT STATEMENT RE: SEALING OF ORDER ON MOTION TO REOPEN FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF MODIFYING THE PROSECUTION BAR (Case No. 14-cv-02717, D.I. 100 ) by BlackBerry Corporation, HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Biddinger, Brian) (Filed on 4/22/2015) Modified on 4/23/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) ORDER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/20/2015. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/20/2015 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***(Filed in this case only per CRD)*** Modified on 4/30/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF). ***UNSEALED PER COURT ORDER 102 *** (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2015 re 80 MOTION For Leave to Move to Reopen for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Prosecution Bar filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. The matter was argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (FTR Time 9:30-10:01)Plaintiff Attorney: Seth Northrop Defendant Attorneys: Gabrielle Higgins & Christopher Bonny (Samsung); Jerry Selinger (HTC); Tala Toufanian (Blackberry) This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2015) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Northrop (Northrop, Seth) (Filed on 4/13/2015) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8259438.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Jenner, Jesse) (Filed on 12/27/2013) (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8254277.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(De Costa, Frank) (Filed on 12/24/2013) (Entered: 12/24/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8253032.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sonu, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8252760.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kurpinski, Christopher) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8252639.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Hong, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8247906.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sanabria, Cecilia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jerry R. Selinger representing Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8235883.) filed by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Selinger, Jerry) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Eastern District of Texas (Beaumont) re 1:12-cv-00557 RC signed by Judge Ron Clark. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where High Tech Computer Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HTC America Inc is a litigant