This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:07:05 (UTC).

Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Netflix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Netflix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00849

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC

Defendant

Netflix, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cyrus A. Morton

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel R. Burgess

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Frederick William Sultan, IV

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP

One America Center, 600 Congress Avenue, Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701-2978

Kristine A. Tietz

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Patrick M. Arenz

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2800 Lasalle Plaza, 800 Lasalle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Ronald J. Schutz

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, 2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Shira T. Shapiro

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Mark T. Mitchell

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP

One America Center, 600 Congress Avenue, Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701-2978

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos R. Soltero

Attorney at McGinnis Lochridge

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2100

Austin, TX 78701

David D. Schumann

Attorney at Tyz Marton Schumann LP

28 2Nd Street, #3119

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard D. Milvenan

Attorney at McGinnis Lochridge and Kilgore, L.L.P.

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2100

Austin, TX 78701

Ryan J. Marton

Attorney at Tyz Marton Schumann LP

28 2Nd Street, Suite 3119

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ryan A. Tyz

Attorney at Tyz Marton Schumann LP

28 2Nd Street, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

#19

#20

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Netflix, Inc., re 17 Opposed MOTION to Strike Almeroth Declaration filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 17 Opposed MOTION to Strike Almeroth Declaration filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tietz, Kristine) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Netflix, Inc., re 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Opposed MOTION to Strike Almeroth Declaration by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kevin C. Almeroth, # 2 Affidavit Kristine A. Tietz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Proposed Order)(Tietz, Kristine) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tietz, Kristine) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Ryan Marton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7948053) by on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Ryan Tyz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7948017) by on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for David Schumann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7947889) by on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Netflix, Inc. served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. (Mitchell, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with a copy of complaint. (so) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Netflix, Inc.. (so) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Mitchell, Mark) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/22/2015 to flatten image) (so). Modified on 9/22/2015 (so). (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Mitchell, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Mitchell, Mark) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/22/2015 to flatten image) (so). (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7803921), filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETFLIX INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R. Burgess

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark T. Mitchell