This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 10:57:59 (UTC).

Advanced Media Networks, LLC v. ViaSat, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2015 Advanced Media Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ViaSat, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes and Judge Roger T. Benitez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes

Judge

Judge Roger T. Benitez

 

Party Details

Defendants

LiveTV, LLC

JetBlue Airlines Corp.

Counter Defendant

Advanced Media Networks, LLC

Counter Claimant

ViaSat, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alfred Mamlet

Attorney at Steptoe & Johson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Daniel A Lawton

Attorney at Lawton Law Firm

402 West Broadway, Suite 1860

San Diego, CA 92101

John Caracappa

Attorney at Steptoe & Johson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Scott Richey

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-1795

Joe Saratool Netikosol

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-1795

Stephanie Koh

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

Matthew S Jorgenson

Attorney at Sidney Austin

555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Thomas Rein

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

Bryan Mulder

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

Gwen Hochman Stewart

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Seth H Ostrow

George D Zalepa

Jeffrey P Weingart

Todd Neal

Sean Michael Sullivan

Counter Claimant Attorney

Yury Kapgan

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. (fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5,960,074*, *6,445,777* cc:USPTO (fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER. Judge Michael M. Anello has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv143-BEN(KSC) (no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ViaSat, Inc. (Kapgan, Yury)Attorney Yury Kapgan added to party ViaSat, Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ViaSat, Inc. answer due 5/15/2015. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/14/2015. (knb) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. ViaSat, Inc. served. (Neal, Todd) (knb). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. JetBlue Airlines Corp. served. (Neal, Todd) (knb). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#54

(#54) ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendants' Motion to Stay on or before July 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/12/2015. (knb) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#55

(#55) Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting 50 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination of Asserted Patents. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 7/20/2015 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#56

(#56) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 7/21/2015. Case did not settle. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Seth Ostrow, George Zalepa, Jeffrey Weingart). (Defendant Attorney Yury Kapgan and Patrick Schmidt (ViaSat), Tom Rein and Stephanie Koh (Jet Blue), Alfred Mamlet (Live TV)). (no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

#57

(#57) Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 7/21/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2015 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/23/2015.(knb) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

#58

(#58) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Zalepa, George) (knb). (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#59

(#59) ORDER Granting 58 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/4/2015. (knb) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#60

(#60) ORDER granting 50 Motion to Stay. Case stayed until pending resolution of the PTO reexamination proceedings. Defendants must notify the Court within two days of the issuance of a decision by the PTO regarding this matter. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/12/2015. (kcm) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#61

(#61) In light of the district judge staying this case, the court VACATES the Case Management Conference (CMC) set for August 21, 2015. The parties must contact these chambers within three days of the stay being lifted to set a new CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/20/2015.(no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#62

(#62) NOTICE by JetBlue Airlines Corp., LiveTV, LLC, ViaSat, Inc. Notice of Decision in Reexamination (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Notice of Intent to Issue Reexamination Certificate)(Mulder, Bryan) (knb). (Entered: 10/08/2015)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) NOTICE by JetBlue Airlines Corp., LiveTV, LLC, ViaSat, Inc. Notice of Decision in Reexamination (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Notice of Intent to Issue Reexamination Certificate)(Mulder, Bryan) (knb). (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) In light of the district judge staying this case, the court VACATES the Case Management Conference (CMC) set for August 21, 2015. The parties must contact these chambers within three days of the stay being lifted to set a new CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/20/2015.(no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER granting 50 Motion to Stay. Case stayed until pending resolution of the PTO reexamination proceedings. Defendants must notify the Court within two days of the issuance of a decision by the PTO regarding this matter. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/12/2015. (kcm) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER Granting 58 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/4/2015. (knb) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Zalepa, George) (knb). (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 7/21/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2015 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/23/2015.(knb) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 7/21/2015. Case did not settle. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Seth Ostrow, George Zalepa, Jeffrey Weingart). (Defendant Attorney Yury Kapgan and Patrick Schmidt (ViaSat), Tom Rein and Stephanie Koh (Jet Blue), Alfred Mamlet (Live TV)). (no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting 50 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination of Asserted Patents. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 7/20/2015 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendants' Motion to Stay on or before July 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/12/2015. (knb) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination of Asserted Patents filed by JetBlue Airlines Corp., LiveTV, LLC, ViaSat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yury Kapgan In Support Of Joint Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Kapgan, Yury) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. LiveTV, LLC served. (Neal, Todd) (knb). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. JetBlue Airlines Corp. served. (Neal, Todd) (knb). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. ViaSat, Inc. served. (Neal, Todd) (knb). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ViaSat, Inc. answer due 5/15/2015. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/14/2015. (knb) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ViaSat, Inc. (Kapgan, Yury)Attorney Yury Kapgan added to party ViaSat, Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER. Judge Michael M. Anello has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv143-BEN(KSC) (no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5,960,074*, *6,445,777* cc:USPTO (fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. (fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-7735988.), filed by Advanced Media Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-F)The new case number is 3:15-cv-143-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Neal, S.)(fth) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less