This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:47:22 (UTC).

Adrain v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Adrain filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Nissan Motor Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00591

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

John B. Adrain

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Deborah J Race

Attorney at Ireland Carroll & Kelley

6101 S Broadway, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75703

Daymon Jeffrey Rambin

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

John T Polasek

Attorney at Polasek, Quisenberry & Errington, LLP

6750 West Loop South, Suite 920

Bellaire, TX 77401

Otis W Carroll, Jr

Attorney at Ireland Carroll & Kelley

6101 S Broadway, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75703

C. Dale Quisenberry

Attorney at Polasek, Quisenberry & Errington, LLP

6750 West Loop South, Suite 920

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey Scott Patterson

Attorney at Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer, LLP - Dallas

8750 North Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Sean Hsu

Attorney at Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer, LLP - Dallas

8750 North Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

J Thad Heartfield

Attorney at The Heartfield Law Firm

2195 Dowlen Rd

Beaumont, TX 77706

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of John B. Adrain (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#25

(#25) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/2/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#18

(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polasek, John) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5179781.), filed by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John T Polasek on behalf of John B. Adrain (Polasek, John) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

#20

(#20) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Resolution by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polasek, John) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John B. Adrain. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of John B. Adrain (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of John B. Adrain (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay deadlines applicable between Adrain, Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. are stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Adrain. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 5/8/2015, answer due 5/29/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/20/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#7

(#7) ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY.***SUMMONS Issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (ch, ) Modified on 5/7/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#23

(#23) Agreed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice as to Defendants Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polasek, John) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Agreed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice as to Defendants Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polasek, John) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of John B. Adrain (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay deadlines applicable between Adrain, Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. are stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Resolution by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polasek, John) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/20/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polasek, John) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/2/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Dale Quisenberry on behalf of John B. Adrain (Quisenberry, C.) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John T Polasek on behalf of John B. Adrain (Polasek, John) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Adrain. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 5/8/2015, answer due 5/29/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY.***SUMMONS Issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (ch, ) Modified on 5/7/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of John B. Adrain (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of John B. Adrain (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John B. Adrain. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5179781.), filed by John B. Adrain. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.