This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:10:45 (UTC).

ADP Dealer Services, Inc. v. Suggs

Case Summary

On 07/08/2014 ADP Dealer Services, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Suggs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Sam Sparks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00631

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Sam Sparks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADP Dealer Services, Inc.

Defendant

Robert W. Suggs, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard D. Milvenan

Attorney at McGinnis Lochridge and Kilgore, L.L.P.

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2100

Austin, TX 78701

Laura A. Chubb

Attorney at Frommer Lawrence & Haug LLP

745 Fifth Avenue, Floor 10

New York, NY 10151

Joseph V. Saphia

Attorney at Frommer Lawrence & Haug LLP

745 Fifth Avenue, Floor 10

New York, NY 10151

Defendant Attorneys

Eric W. Buether

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher M. Joe

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6639990), filed by ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exh A, # 3 Exhibit Exh B, # 4 Summons)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

#2

(#2) Letters to Joseph V. Saphia and Laura A. Chubb re: non-admitted status. (os) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Robert W. Suggs, Sr. (os) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#4

(#4) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of complaint. (os) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADP Dealer Services, Inc. as to Robert W. Suggs, Sr . Waiver sent on 7/9/2014, answer due 9/8/2014. (Milvenan, Richard) Modified docket text on 7/10/2014 (kkc). (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Laura Chubb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6651126) by on behalf of ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Laura A. Chubb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Joseph Saphia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6655176) by on behalf of ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Joseph V. Saphia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Robert Suggs, Sr.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Defendant Rober W. Suggs, Sr.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Robert W. Suggs, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#22

(#22) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Robert W. Suggs, Sr, re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Robert Suggs, Sr.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Robert W. Suggs, Sr. Defendant Robert W. Suggs, Sr.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 10/13/2014)

#23

(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Hearing on 14 Motion to Dismiss held on 10/23/2014 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.) (kkc) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

#24

(#24) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Replead by ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

#25

(#25) ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Replead its Complaint; Plaintiff's deadline to file its Amended Complaint is 12/12/2014. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

#26

(#26) STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION by ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#27

(#27) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

#28

(#28) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kkc) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#29

(#29) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 23, 2014, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/29/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2015, (Reznik, Lily) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 23, 2014, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/29/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2015, (Reznik, Lily) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kkc) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION by ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Replead its Complaint; Plaintiff's deadline to file its Amended Complaint is 12/12/2014. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Replead by ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Hearing on 14 Motion to Dismiss held on 10/23/2014 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.) (kkc) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Robert W. Suggs, Sr, re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Robert Suggs, Sr.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Robert W. Suggs, Sr. Defendant Robert W. Suggs, Sr.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 10/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Robert Suggs, Sr.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Defendant Rober W. Suggs, Sr.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Robert W. Suggs, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER (All Pending Matters set for 10/23/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 10/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Robert W. Suggs, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Joseph V. Saphia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Joseph Saphia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6655176) by on behalf of ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Laura A. Chubb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Laura Chubb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6651126) by on behalf of ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADP Dealer Services, Inc. as to Robert W. Suggs, Sr . Waiver sent on 7/9/2014, answer due 9/8/2014. (Milvenan, Richard) Modified docket text on 7/10/2014 (kkc). (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of complaint. (os) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Robert W. Suggs, Sr. (os) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letters to Joseph V. Saphia and Laura A. Chubb re: non-admitted status. (os) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6639990), filed by ADP Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exh A, # 3 Exhibit Exh B, # 4 Summons)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. Joe(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric W. Buether(Designation Retained)