This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 16:28:40 (UTC).

Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Tejas Research LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2014 Adobe Systems Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tejas Research LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Edward M. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00868

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adobe Systems Incorporated

Defendant

Tejas Research LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marcus Alan Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, Friedman LLP

1349 W. Peachtree Street, N.W., Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Keith J. Mitro

Attorney at Kaye Scholer LLP

Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 400, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Heather S. Kim

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Uttam Gajanan Dubal

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

1117 S. California Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Robert P. Watkins, III

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres and Friedman LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Jeffrey James Toney

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP

Two Midtown Plaza, Suite 1500, 1349 West Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Steven C. Carlson

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jonathan K. Waldrop

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres and Friedman LLP

1349 W. Peachtree St., Nw, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Darcy Lachelle Jones

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman LLP

1349 Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Lawrence Okey Onyejekwe, Jr

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Defendant Attorneys

Kris S. LeFan

Attorney at Lowe & Associates, P.C.

11400 Olympic Blvd., Suite 640

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Law Firm, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste 310

Dallas, TX 75231

Neal Gopal Massand

Attorney at Ni, Wang Associates

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 310

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Adobe Systems Incorporated (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

#4

(#4) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-8406887 by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

#5

(#5) Case assigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Tejas Research LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

#8

(#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

#9

(#9) CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)

#48

(#48) ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD ** NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Robert P. Watkins, III (regarding transcript filed at Dkt. 46) (Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#49

(#49) REPLY (re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Response to Supplemental Opposition to Motion filed byTejas Research LLC. (Massand, Neal) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#50

(#50) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing on Tejas's Motion to Dismiss filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anna Lam in Support of Adobe's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing on Tejas's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Adobe's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing on Tejas's Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit A (HIGHLIGHTED))(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#51

(#51) CLERK'S NOTICE vacating hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss set for 9/18/14. Court to issue order on papers. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

#52

(#52) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

#53

(#53) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 50 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

#54

(#54) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#55

(#55) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#56

(#56) REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 50 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) CLERK'S NOTICE vacating hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss set for 9/18/14. Court to issue order on papers. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing on Tejas's Motion to Dismiss filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anna Lam in Support of Adobe's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing on Tejas's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Adobe's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing on Tejas's Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit A (HIGHLIGHTED))(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) REPLY (re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Response to Supplemental Opposition to Motion filed byTejas Research LLC. (Massand, Neal) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD ** NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Robert P. Watkins, III (regarding transcript filed at Dkt. 46) (Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert P. Watkins III in Support of Adobe's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Supplemental Opposition to Tejas's Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits in Support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Adobe's Administrative Motion For Leave to File Under Seal its Supplemental Opposition to Tejas's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Exhibits, # 3 Adobe's Supplemental Opposition to Tejas's Motion to Dismiss (Redacted), # 4 Adobe's Supplemental Opposition to Tejas's Motion to Dismiss (Unmarked), # 5 Adobe's Supplemental Opposition to Tejas's Motion to Dismiss (Highlighted), # 6 Declaration of Robert P. Watkins III in Support of Adobe's Supplemental Opposition to Tejas's Motion to Dismiss, # 7 Exhibit A- (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit B- (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit C- (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit D- (Filed Under Seal))(Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 8/28/2014) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for 1 Complaint, [1-1] Exhibit A to Complaint, [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet, 3 Certification of Interested Parties & Corporate Disclosure Statement, 6 Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, 7 Issued Summons, 8 Judge Chen Civil Pretrial Instructions, 9 Judge Chen - Standing Order-Civil-General, 10 Judge Chen - Standing Order - Civil - Discovery, 11 Northern District of California Standing Order for All Judges served on Tejas Research, LLC on March 20, 2014, filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Tejas Research LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case assigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-8406887 by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Adobe Systems Incorporated (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,006,231 against Tejas Research LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8406917.). Filed byAdobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.