This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:28:37 (UTC).

Adaptix, Inc. v. Ericsson, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2014 Adaptix, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ericsson, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Adaptix, Inc.

Counter Claimants

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Ericsson, Inc.

Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

David Keyzer

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Meredith Joelle Fitzpatrick

Paul J Hayes

Barry Bumgardner

Brent Nelson Bumgardner

Steven E Lipman

Edward R Nelson, III

Charles Craig Tadlock

Keith Bryan Smiley

Kevin Gannon

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Douglas Mark Kubehl

Jonathan Bell Rubenstein

Jennifer Parker Ainsworth

Not Classified By Court Attorney

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Smiley, Keith) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. ADAPTIX, INC.'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc. and emailed to plt for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#191

(#191) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rubenstein, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from 12/1/15 Summary Judgment Hearing Transcript, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Verizons First Supplemental Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Sprints First Supplemental Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from 12/11/15 Trial Transcripts, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from 12/10/15 Trial Transcripts, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from 12/17/15 Trial Transcripts, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#192

(#192) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#193

(#193) ORDER Terminating as MOOT 125 Sealed Document (Defendant's Objections to Judge Craven's Order Denying Motion to Compel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/11/2016. (sm, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#194

(#194) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#195

(#195) SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 141 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit F 2015-12-17 Green Depo Excerpts) (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#196

(#196) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becker, # 2 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from 12/15/15 ALU Trial Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts from 12/16/15 ALU Trial Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Wells, # 5 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from 12/15/16 ALU Trial Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from 9/30/14 Deposition of Wells, # 7 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from 8/28/13 Deposition of Wells)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#197

(#197) Sealed Document (Defendants' Objections to Order Terminating their Objections to Order Denying Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding AT&T Documents (Dkt. No. 408). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becker, # 2 Exhibit A - AD00003653, # 3 Exhibit B - AD00003651)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#198

(#198) SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#199

(#199) SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

190 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#199) SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#198) SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#197) Sealed Document (Defendants' Objections to Order Terminating their Objections to Order Denying Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding AT&T Documents (Dkt. No. 408). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becker, # 2 Exhibit A - AD00003653, # 3 Exhibit B - AD00003651)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#196) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becker, # 2 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from 12/15/15 ALU Trial Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts from 12/16/15 ALU Trial Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Wells, # 5 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from 12/15/16 ALU Trial Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from 9/30/14 Deposition of Wells, # 7 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from 8/28/13 Deposition of Wells)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#195) SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 141 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit F 2015-12-17 Green Depo Excerpts) (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#193) ORDER Terminating as MOOT 125 Sealed Document (Defendant's Objections to Judge Craven's Order Denying Motion to Compel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/11/2016. (sm, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#192) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#191) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rubenstein, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from 12/1/15 Summary Judgment Hearing Transcript, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Verizons First Supplemental Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Sprints First Supplemental Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from 12/11/15 Trial Transcripts, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from 12/10/15 Trial Transcripts, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from 12/17/15 Trial Transcripts, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#190) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 141 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rubenstein, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from 9.22.14 Deposition of Green, # 3 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from 12.17.15 Deposition of Green)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc. and emailed to plt for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. ADAPTIX, INC.'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Smiley, Keith) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4667637.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 05/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.