This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 13:31:51 (UTC).

Adams v. Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2014 Adams filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-07812

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Adams

Defendants

Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Daniel John McGarry

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Mohammed Omar Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathon D. Drews

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

222 N. Lasalle St., Ste. 300

Chicago, IL 60601

Palak Naimesh Shah

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601

Justin M Penn

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601-1081

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601-1081

Lindsey A.L. Conley

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

222 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60601

Avanti Deepak Bakane

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

222 N. Lasalle, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601

Katherine Hannah Tresley

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp

222 N. Lasalle, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Relief Pursuant to the Federal Fair Debt Collection Practices Act filed by Michael Adams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9933665. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Adams by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Adams by Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First (Sulaiman, Ahmad) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Adams by Daniel John McGarry (McGarry, Daniel) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Initial status hearing set for December 4, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/9/2014. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 10/14/2014, answer due 11/4/2014. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams as to Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC on 10/14/2014, answer due 11/4/2014. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by Justin M Penn (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#21

(#21) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Corporate Disclosure (Tresley, Katherine) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC(Shah, Palak) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#23

(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing. Discovery ordered closed by 5/29/2015. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 1:30 PM.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

#24

(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by Jonathon D. Drews (Drews, Jonathon) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#25

(#25) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 19, 2014, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 306 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on January 16, 2015. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/16/2015. Mailed notices.(mgh, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#26

(#26) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by Lindsey A.L. Conley (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#27

(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: This case having been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Alonso, the following dates before Judge Darrah are vacated: pretrial conference set for 2/3/16 and jury trial set for 2/8/16. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

#28

(#28) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/29/15.(mmy, ) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

#29

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Pursuant to the Courts order at [ECF No. 16] consolidating various related cases for all purposes, it is hereby ordered that any future filings be docketed under case number 14 C 6694, with the caption for such filings starting with case number 14 C 6694 as the lead case and further listing all the related cases.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Pursuant to the Courts order at [ECF No. 16] consolidating various related cases for all purposes, it is hereby ordered that any future filings be docketed under case number 14 C 6694, with the caption for such filings starting with case number 14 C 6694 as the lead case and further listing all the related cases.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/29/15.(mmy, ) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: This case having been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Alonso, the following dates before Judge Darrah are vacated: pretrial conference set for 2/3/16 and jury trial set for 2/8/16. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by Lindsey A.L. Conley (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 19, 2014, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 306 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on January 16, 2015. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/16/2015. Mailed notices.(mgh, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by Jonathon D. Drews (Drews, Jonathon) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing. Discovery ordered closed by 5/29/2015. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 1:30 PM.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC(Shah, Palak) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Corporate Disclosure (Tresley, Katherine) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Corporate Disclosure & Notification as to Affiliates by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Tresley, Katherine) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by Palak Naimesh Shah (Shah, Palak) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by Justin M Penn (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams as to Freedman Anselmo Lindberg LLC on 10/14/2014, answer due 11/4/2014. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 10/14/2014, answer due 11/4/2014. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Initial status hearing set for December 4, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/9/2014. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Adams by Daniel John McGarry (McGarry, Daniel) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Adams by Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First (Sulaiman, Ahmad) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Adams by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Relief Pursuant to the Federal Fair Debt Collection Practices Act filed by Michael Adams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9933665. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less