This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:13:08 (UTC).

Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. v. Lee

Case Summary

On 10/01/2015 Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01266

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Defendant

HON. Michelle K. Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clyde Elbert Findley

Attorney at Cloudigy Law PLLC

8300 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1250

Mclean, VA 22102

Antigone Gabriella Peyton

Attorney at Cloudigy Law PLLC

8300 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1250

Mclean, VA 22102

Defendant Attorney

David Moskowitz

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (Alexandria-NA)

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION to Remand to United States Patent and Trademark Office by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and by Michelle K. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER - Finding good cause to do so. the parties request is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report to this Court by February 26, 2016. This report shall provide a proposal for resolving the remainingissues raised in the Complaint and shall include any motions directed to remand issues.Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/12/16. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STATUS REPORT by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that this present litigation is STAYED and held in abeyance pending the decision on appeal by the Federal Circuit in Pfizer v. Lee, No. 15-1265. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report to this Court within 21 days of the Federal Circuit's decision on appeal, providing a proposal for resolving the remaining issues raised in Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/13/16. (klau, ) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM OPINION re Motion to stay. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/13/16. (klau, ) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting 16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/11/16. (klau, ) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Hoxie and Certification of Local Counsel Clyde E. Findley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4799967. by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Stay filed by Michelle K. Lee. (Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Antigone Gabriella Peyton on behalf of Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (Peyton, Antigone) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Stay filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Antigone G. Peyton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Peyton, Antigone) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Memorandum in Support re 9 MOTION to Stay filed by Michelle K. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 DEX A, # 2 DEX B)(Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Stay by Michelle K. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Michelle K. Lee.(Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Moskowitz on behalf of Michelle K. Lee (Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michelle K. Lee (klau, ) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney served on 10/5/2015, answer due 12/4/2015. (klau, ) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the US Attorney General. (rban, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Michelle K. Lee, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General via SPS. (kgra, ) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (kgra, ) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Michelle K. Lee ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683054388.), filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Letter, # 7 Receipt)(kgra, ) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS US, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antigone Gabriella Peyton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clyde Elbert Findley