This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 16:36:09 (UTC).

Abrams et al v. Anthem Inc. n/k/a WellPoint, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2008 Abrams filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anthem Inc n/k/a WellPoint, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan and Judge S Arthur Spiegel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:08-CV-00750

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan

Judge

Judge S Arthur Spiegel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linden E. Rader

Wilma Hartley

John W. Gerberick

Rocky L. Helton

Diana Wisecup

Barbara M. Johnson

Billy Keen

Duane Brookbank

Michael R. Hill

Estate of Carol B. Willeke

Theresa A. Brosius

Diane M.S. Halcomb

Helene Warren

Gene E. Willeke

Anna J. McIlvaine

Steven D. Wilson

Randy W. Marcum

Defendants

Miami University

Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.

Community Insurance Company

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis P. Barron

582 Torrence Lane

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Eric H Zagrans

6480 Rockside Woods Blvd., Ste. 180

Cleveland, OH 44131

Michael F Becker

Attorney at The Becker Law Firm LPA

50 Public Square, 35Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Anne K Ricchiuto

Attorney at Baker & Daniels LLP

300 N. Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Christopher G Scanlon

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

300 N. Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Glenn Virgil Whitaker

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease

301 E Fourth Street, Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Kent Allen Britt

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E 4Th St., Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Kevin M Kimmerling

Attorney at Baker & Daniels LLP

300 N. Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Robert Neal Webner

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

52 E Gay Street, Po Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Matthew T Albaugh

Attorney at Baker & Daniels, LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Paul Alan Wolfla

Attorney at Baker & Daniels LLP

300 N Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Money Damages and Equitable Relief against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 paid - receipt number: 06480000000001896062), filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 10/24/2008)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to amend calendar orders accordingly by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order consolidating five cases) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 11/11/2008)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by CJ Beckwith. Case reassigned to Judge S Arthur Spiegel due to related case. (mb) (Entered: 12/23/2008)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs are hereby directed to show cause on or before 3/16/2009 why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 2/24/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter) by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/30/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrea Schell with Exhibits) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/06/2009)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Community Insurance Company. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Anthem, Inc.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher G. Scanlon (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

#32

(#32) MOTION for Protective Order to prevent depositions of passive class members by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2009)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2009 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge S Arthur Spiegel. Five-day Jury Trial set for 1/26/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 842 before Judge S Arthur Spiegel on an on-deck basis. (km1, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)

#34

(#34) MOTION for Protective Order excusing passive class members from responding to written discovery requests by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 08/17/2009)

#35

(#35) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 9/16/2009. Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Dispositive Motions by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Dispositive Motions) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2009)

#36

(#36) ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 9/16/2009 to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 8/27/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 08/27/2009)

#37

(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Protective Order to prevent depositions of passive class members, 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief, 34 MOTION for Protective Order excusing passive class members from responding to written discovery requests filed by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wolfla Declaration and exhibits thereto) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 09/01/2009)

#38

(#38) ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. The Plaintiff shall electronically file the Second Amended Complaint, which shall include an appropriate certificate of service pursuant to Local Rule 5.2(a), with the Court via CM/ECF forthwith. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 9/11/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)

#39

(#39) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Darrell T. Abrams, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton, Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup. (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2009)

#40

(#40) NOTATION ORDER entering 39 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 9/17/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 09/17/2009)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTATION ORDER entering 39 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 9/17/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 09/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Darrell T. Abrams, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton, Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup. (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. The Plaintiff shall electronically file the Second Amended Complaint, which shall include an appropriate certificate of service pursuant to Local Rule 5.2(a), with the Court via CM/ECF forthwith. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 9/11/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Protective Order to prevent depositions of passive class members, 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief, 34 MOTION for Protective Order excusing passive class members from responding to written discovery requests filed by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wolfla Declaration and exhibits thereto) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 09/01/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 9/16/2009 to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 8/27/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 08/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 9/16/2009. Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Dispositive Motions by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Dispositive Motions) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION for Protective Order excusing passive class members from responding to written discovery requests by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 08/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2009 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge S Arthur Spiegel. Five-day Jury Trial set for 1/26/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 842 before Judge S Arthur Spiegel on an on-deck basis. (km1, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for Protective Order to prevent depositions of passive class members by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Amended Complaint,,, for Money Damages and Equitable Relief by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne K. Ricchiuto (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher G. Scanlon (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Anthem, Inc.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Community Insurance Company. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter) by Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Community Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/30/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrea Schell with Exhibits) (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/06/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs are hereby directed to show cause on or before 3/16/2009 why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 2/24/2009. (km1, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by CJ Beckwith. Case reassigned to Judge S Arthur Spiegel due to related case. (mb) (Entered: 12/23/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to amend calendar orders accordingly by Plaintiffs Michael R. Hill, Myron Horn, Barbara M. Johnson, Billy Keen, Randy W. Marcum, Anna J. McIlvaine, Linden E. Rader, Paulette Rader, Helene Warren, Estate of Carol B. Willeke, Darrell T. Abrams, Gene E. Willeke, Steven D. Wilson, Diana Wisecup, Duane Brookbank, Theresa A. Brosius, John W. Gerberick, Diane M.S. Halcomb, Ronald Halcomb, Wilma Hartley, Elizabeth Haven, Rocky L. Helton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order consolidating five cases) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 11/11/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Money Damages and Equitable Relief against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 paid - receipt number: 06480000000001896062), filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N) (Zagrans, Eric) (Entered: 10/24/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami University is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Albaugh