This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2016 at 20:10:45 (UTC).

ABC v. DEF

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 ABC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against DEF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00981

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arista Records LLC

Atlantic Recording Corporation

Warner Bros. Records Inc.

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

Sony Music Entertainment

ABC

Capitol Records, LLC

Laface Records LLC

Zomba Recording LLC

Warner Music Group Corp.

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-10

DEF

Cesar Chavez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth Lewinn Doroshow

Attorney at Jenner & Block, LLP (DC)

1099 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Lindsay Warren Bowen, Jr

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP (NYC )

919 Third Avenue, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#12

12 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Kenneth L. Doroshow submitted pursuant to the Court's February 22, 2016 Order. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Laface Records LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner Music Group Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doroshow, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) COMPLAINT against Cesar Chavez, Does 1-10. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Zomba Recording LLC, Laface Records LLC, Warner Music Group Corp., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Arista Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Warner Bros. Records Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #3 and unsealed by doc. #9)(lmb) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO SEAL FILE: Upon consideration of the above-named Plaintiffs' Application for an Order to File Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall maintain the documents associated with Plaintiffs' ex parte application for a temporary restraining order, seizure order, and order to show cause for preliminary injunction under seal pending further order of the Court. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #3 and unsealed by doc. #9) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/9/2016 at 12:58 p.m.) (lmb) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. On February 10, 2016, the Court issued a temporary restraining order against Defendants and issued an order to show cause for a preliminary injunction with a hearing scheduled for February 25, 2016. Defendants were served with these documents on February 12, 2016. Defendants did not submit opposition papers by the deadline indicated in the order to show cause and have failed to notice an appearance in this case. Pursuant to the Court's order dated February 22, 2016, the Court informed the parties that if Defendants failed to submit answering papers on the order to show cause by 5:00 p.m. on February 24, 2016, or otherwise failed to indicate a willingness to participate in this litigation, the Court would grant the request for a preliminary injunction and would adjourn the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for February 25, 2016. As of February 25, 2016, Defendants have failed to submit answering papers on the order to show cause and have failed to otherwise indicate a willingness to participate in this litigation. However, the Court's February 22, 2016 directed Plaintiffs to serve a copy of that order on Defendants and provide the Court with proof of service by Wednesday, February 24, 2016. The Court has not yet received such proof of service. Because Defendants were served with the original temporary restraining order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction and have not submitted answering papers or filed a notice of appearance, the Court will adjourn the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for this afternoon, February 25, 2016. However, the Court will not grant Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction until it receives proof of service with respect to the Court's February 22, 2016 order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/25/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, On February 22, 2015, the Court indicated that it would unseal this case if Plaintiffs did not submit a letter opposing unsealing by 9:00 a.m. today, Thursday, February 25, 2016. that deadline has passed and no such letter has been received. Therefore the Court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to unseal this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 02/25/2016) (mps) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. (mps) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 02/09/2016) (mps) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAFACE RECORDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZOMBA RECORDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER BROS. RECORDS, INC., a Delaware Corporation is a litigant