This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

911 Notify LLC v. Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2014 911 Notify LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Leonard P. Stark and Judge Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01152

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Judge Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

911 Notify LLC

Defendants

Bosch Security Systems Inc.

Robert Bosch GmbH

Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Richard D. Kirk

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Benjamin T. Wang

Sara E. Bussiere

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jay C. Chung

Marc A. Fenster

Defendant Attorney

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1120

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bosch Security Systems Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1584110.) - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,775,356;. (els) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Benjamin T. Wang, and C. Jay Chung - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc. A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Benjamin T. Wang, # 3 Certification of C. Jay Chung)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 911 Notify LLC. Bosch Security Systems Inc. served on 9/11/2014, answer due 10/2/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

#6

(#6) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/14. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01145-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems, Inc. on September 11, 2014, filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER /Procedures Order by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to /Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Until January 31, 2015 - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Bosch Security Systems Inc..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#14

(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Robert Bosch GmbH for Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc. filed by Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#15

(#15) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Robert Bosch GmbH for Bosch Security Systems Inc. filed by Bosch Security Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Parties to Jointly File the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and Related Materials to April 30, 2015 by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#17

(#17) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Parties' to Jointly File the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and related materials from April 30, 2015 to May 14, 2015 by 911 Notify LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to jointly file the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and related materials to May 31, 2015 - filed by Bosch Security Systems Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to jointly file the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and related materials to June 30, 2015 - filed by Bosch Security Systems Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#21

(#21) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,775,356. (ntl) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,775,356. (ntl) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to jointly file the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and related materials to June 30, 2015 - filed by Bosch Security Systems Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to jointly file the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and related materials to May 31, 2015 - filed by Bosch Security Systems Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Parties' to Jointly File the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and related materials from April 30, 2015 to May 14, 2015 by 911 Notify LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Parties to Jointly File the Checklist, Proposed Schedule, Status Report, and Related Materials to April 30, 2015 by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Robert Bosch GmbH for Bosch Security Systems Inc. filed by Bosch Security Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Robert Bosch GmbH for Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc. filed by Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Bosch Security Systems Inc..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to /Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Until February 27, 2015 - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to /Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Until January 31, 2015 - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED ORDER /Procedures Order by 911 Notify LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems, Inc. on September 11, 2014, filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/14. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01145-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 911 Notify LLC. Bosch Security Systems Inc. served on 9/11/2014, answer due 10/2/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Benjamin T. Wang, and C. Jay Chung - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc. A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Benjamin T. Wang, # 3 Certification of C. Jay Chung)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,775,356;. (els) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bosch Security Systems Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch Healthcare Systems Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1584110.) - filed by 911 Notify LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less