This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:38:15 (UTC).

511 Innovations, Inc. v. HTC America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2015 511 Innovations, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HTC America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01524

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Defendant

Capella Microsystems, Inc.

Counter Defendant

511 Innovations, Inc.

Counter Claimants

Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited

ZTE (USA) Inc.

HTC Corporation

Huawei Device USA Inc.

HTC America, Inc.

ams AG

Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

AMS-TAOS USA Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Consolidated Defendants

Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC

Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.

Microsoft Mobile Oy

Microsoft Mobile Inc.

ZTE Corporation

Avago Technologies Limited

Microsoft Corporation

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Ernest Richardson

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP - Houston

1221 Mckinney, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010-2010

Michael K Jones

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP - PA

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jay R Mitchell

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP - PA

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Everett McClyde Upshaw

Jamil N Alibhai

Philip Ou

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Yar R Chaikovsky

Catherine Margaret Maness

Melissa Richards Smith

Brian M Berliner

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Debra Coleman

William Ellsworth Davis, III

Counter Claimant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Brian M Berliner

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brian W Nolan

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP - New York

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10004

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Michael J. Word

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP - Chicago

71 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Duane-David Hough

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP - New York

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10004

Eric Stephen Walters

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine - San Francisco

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Erica Dilworth Wilson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine - San Francisco

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Brent Douglas McCabe

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Capella Microsystems, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 511 Innovations, Inc. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to HTC Corporation, Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) \Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited)(nkl, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, re: HTC America, Inc. by 511 Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 511 Innovations, Inc.. Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/12/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 511 Innovations, Inc.. HTC America, Inc. served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/12/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of Huawei Device USA Inc. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#54

(#54) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#55

(#55) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#56

(#56) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Yagura on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#57

(#57) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas J Whilt on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Whilt, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#58

(#58) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Gene Beasley on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Beasley, Anthony) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#59

(#59) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Douglas McCabe on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (McCabe, Brent) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#60

(#60) NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable David Folsom, filed by AMS-TAOS USA Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Capella Microsystems, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ams AG. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#61

(#61) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable David Folsom, filed by AMS-TAOS USA Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Capella Microsystems, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ams AG. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Douglas McCabe on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (McCabe, Brent) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Gene Beasley on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Beasley, Anthony) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas J Whilt on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Whilt, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Yagura on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of Huawei Device USA Inc. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly P Chen on behalf of AMS-TAOS USA Inc., ams AG (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 511 Innovations, Inc.. Capella Microsystems, Inc. served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 511 Innovations, Inc.. HTC America, Inc. served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/12/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 511 Innovations, Inc.. Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/12/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, re: HTC America, Inc. by 511 Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to HTC Corporation, Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) \Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited)(nkl, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 511 Innovations, Inc. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Capella Microsystems, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Capella Microsystems, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Vishay Capella Microsystems (Taiwan) Limited, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5388958.), filed by 511 Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,110,096, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,397,541, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,472,012, # 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,786,844, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less