This case was last updated from National Courts on 03/04/2022 at 06:04:23 (UTC).

Percy et al v. I Grace Co et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Percy filed an Other lawsuit against I Grace Co. This case was filed in National Courts, Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholas G Garaufis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    NYE/1:21-CV-02198

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G Garaufis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Percy

Defendants

I Grace Co

3718 Northern Blvd, #500

Long Island City, NY 11101-1637

L K Comstock & Company Inc

One N Lexington Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

Jaroslawicz & Jaros PLLC

225 Broadway, #2400

New York, NY 10007-3726

K V Power Electric Inc

2928 Newtown Ave

Astoria, NY 11102

Johnson Tannen Brecher Fishman

Hicksville, NY 11801-2887

Jamaica Anesthesia Assoc Pc

8900 Van Wyck Expy

Jamaica, NY 11418-2832

Lawrence's Contractor Inc

13840 226Th St

Springfield Gardens, NY 11413

Jb Screen Ptg & Embroidery

172 Rivington St, #1A

New York, NY 10002-2525

Kaufman Borgeest And Ryan

200 Summit Lake Dr, Ste 110

Valhalla, NY 10595

Icor Associates

485 Us Highway 1 S, Ste 200

Iselin, NJ 08830-3009

Litehouse Builders, Inc.

23 Brooklyn Queens Expy W

Queens, NY 11103

Joseph R Loring & Assoc Inc

360 W 31St St, #14

New York, NY 10001-2799

L Russo Fence Co

220 Industrial Loop

Staten Island, NY 10309-1120

Lower Hudson Regional Info Ctr

Harrison, NY 10528-2400

International Recovery Systems

502 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022-1108

Jacobi Pediatric Clinic

1400 Pelham Pkwy S, #8

Bronx, NY 10461-1197

Lurie Ilchert Macdonnell-Ryan

New York, NY 10016-6901

Innovax-Pillar

249 E 48Th Street

New York, NY 10017

Kel Tech Construction Inc

1211 Redfern Ave

Far Rockaway, NY 11691-3817

1,063 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Judith Heintz Landscape Architecture

62 Pearl Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10004-2435

Ibm

590 Madison Ave, Bsmt L4

New York, NY 10022

Lake Group

17 Vale Pl

Rye, NY 10580-2603

Immigration Filing Svc

299 Broadway#620, #620

New York, NY 10007-1996

Jett Industries Inc

121 Willow Lane, Po Box 219

Colliersville, NY 13747-0219

Long Island Concrete Inc

215-10 Hempstead Avenue

Queens Village, NY 11429

I M Robbins Consulting Engineers

15 W 44Th St, 2Nd Floor

New York, NY 10036-6611

Lamson & Cutner

9 E 40Th St # 1300

New York, NY 10016-0402

Icahn Stadium

10 Central Rd

New York, NY 10035-1167

Interbrand Health

195 Broadway, #18

New York, NY 10007-3174

K M Assoc Of NY Inc

158 W 29Th St, #7

New York, NY 10001-5300

K&M

385 Broadway #1

New York, NY 10013-6032

Kenny Liu

315 Church Street 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Klima New York LLC

4145 39Th St

Long Island City, NY 11104-4201

Jonathan Rose Companies

551 5Th Ave, Fl 23

New York, NY 10176-0001

Jasa-Jewish Assn For Svces

9777 Queens Blvd, #600

Rego Park, NY 11374-3334

Kirschenbaum & Kirschenbaum Pc

200 Garden City Plz # 315

Garden City, NY 11530-3357

Juris Solutions Inc

33 Queens St, #201

Syosset, NY 11791-3063

Intra Build Construction

7501 31St Avenue

Flushing, NY 11370-1811

J.P. & C. Construction, Inc

38 South St

Roslyn Heights, NY 11577-1715

1,059 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (11 in NYN/1:21-cv-00104), ( 17 in MDL No. 3011) Filed by James Matthew Kernan on behalf of Defendants Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, #et al. Donna Hodge, #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 3011 et al. (Kernan, James) ADDED MDL LINK, DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES Modified on 7/7/2021 (RH). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #3 in MDL No. 3011), ( #2 in MDL No. 3011), ( #1 in MDL No. 3011) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 6/10/2021.< br< Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 6/10/2021. Responses due on or before 6/17/2021. Reply, if any, due on or before 6/24/2021. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines < Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/27/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3011, NYE/1:20-cv-06131, NYE/1:21-cv-01366, NYE/1:21-cv-01421, NYE/1:21-cv-01999, NYE/1:21-cv-02006, NYE/1:21-cv-02031, NYE/1:21-cv-02034, NYE/1:21-cv-02035, NYE/1:21-cv-02039, NYE/1:21-cv-02045, NYE/1:21-cv-02175, NYE/1:21-cv-02182, NYE/1:21-cv-02194, NYE/1:21-cv-02198, NYE/1:21-cv-02283, NYE/1:21-cv-02311, NYE/1:21-cv-02313, NYE/1:21-cv-02314, NYE/2:20-cv-06291, NYE/2:21-cv-02009, NYE/2:21-cv-02010, NYE/2:21-cv-02021, NYE/2:21-cv-02022, NYE/2:21-cv-02024, NYE/2:21-cv-02025, NYE/2:21-cv-02029, NYE/2:21-cv-02030, NYE/2:21-cv-02040, NYE/2:21-cv-02050, NYN/1:21-cv-00104, NYN/1:21-cv-00106, NYN/1:21-cv-00109, NYS/1:21-cv-00762 (DP) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#1) MDL Number 3011 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 39) Associated Cases: Pending No. 39, NYE/1:20-cv-06131, NYE/1:21-cv-01366, NYE/1:21- cv-01421, NYE/1:21-cv-01999, NYE/1:21-cv-02006, NYE/1:21-cv-02031, NYE/1:21-cv-02034, NYE/1:21-cv-02035, NYE/1:21-cv-02039, NYE/1:21-cv-02045, NYE/1:21-cv-02175, NYE/1:21-cv-02182, NYE/1:21-cv-02194, NYE/1:21-cv-02198, NYE/1:21-cv-02283, NYE/1:21-cv-02311, NYE/1:21-cv-02313, NYE/1:21-cv-02314, NYE/2:20-cv-06291, NYE/2:21-cv-02009, NYE/2:21-cv-02010, NYE/2:21-cv-02021, NYE/2:21-cv-02022, NYE/2:21-cv-02024, NYE/2:21-cv-02025, NYE/2:21-cv-02029, NYE/2:21-cv-02030, NYE/2:21-cv-02040, NYE/2:21-cv-02050, NYN/1:21-cv-00104, NYN/1:21-cv-00106, NYN/1:21-cv-00109, NYS/1:21-cv-00762 (DP) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Percy is a litigant

Latest cases where International Recovery Systems is a litigant

Latest cases where KV Power, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kel-Tech Construction, Inc. is a litigant