This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:13:37 (UTC).

ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC v. TEVA API INC.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC against TEVA API INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17086

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

James B. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC

Defendant

TEVA API INC.

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. encl. Stipulation and proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TEVA API INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913489) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA API INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. TEVA API INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this action is extended by thirty (30) days to November 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/15/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

7 #1

Stipulation and proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA API INC. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of TEVA API INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVA API INC.. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC identifying Cadila Healthcare Limited as Corporate Parent.. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of TEVA API INC. (O'REILLY, KATELYN) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of TEVA API INC. (O'REILLY, KATELYN) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this action is extended by thirty (30) days to November 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/15/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVA API INC.. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. encl. Stipulation and proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of TEVA API INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA API INC. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. TEVA API INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC identifying Cadila Healthcare Limited as Corporate Parent.. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA API INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint for case 2:19-17086 submitted by Joseph N Froehlich on 8/22/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against TEVA API INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913489) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.