This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2021 at 09:26:38 (UTC).

Zwiebel v. Tony

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Zwiebel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tony. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Smith and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61795

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berl Zwiebel

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendants

Sheriff Gregory Tony

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

Gregory Tony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Abraham Citron

Attorney at MAC Legal, PA

3100 N. 29Th Court, Suite 100

Hollywood, FL 33020

Kristen Diane Montgomery

Attorney at MAC Legal PA.

3100 N. 29Th Ave, 33020

Hollywood, FL 33063

Defendant Attorneys

David Lawrence Ferguson

Attorney at The Kopelowitz & Ostrow Firm PA

200 S.W. 1St Avenue, 12Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-4216

Seth David Haimovitch

Attorney at Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert

One West Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#17

#16

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#14

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#10

#9

#6

#5

#3

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice. Plaintiff subsequently filed an Amended Complaint [DE 21]. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/22/2021. (zgs) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory Tony, filed by Berl Zwiebel.(Montgomery, Kristen) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 10/18/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2022., Expert Discovery due by 5/6/2022., Fact Discovery due by 5/6/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 1/1/2022., Mediation Deadline 5/20/2022., In Limine Motions due by 8/18/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2022., Motions due by 8/18/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/18/2022.)and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. All parties must participate in mediation by May 20, 2022. By December 01, 2021, the parties shall file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation, setting out the name of the mediator and the date, time, and place for the mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/20/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than October 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/28/2021. (zgs) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by Berl Zwiebel. (Montgomery, Kristen) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Gregory Tony (Haimovitch, Seth) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Gregory Tony (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haimovitch, Seth) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by Gregory Tony. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (Haimovitch, Seth) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/13/2021. (zgs) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Lawrence Ferguson on behalf of Gregory Tony. Attorney David Lawrence Ferguson added to party Gregory Tony(pty:dft). (Ferguson, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/15/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Party Served Entered; ERROR - The incorrect party served was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#7]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (drz) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Berl Zwiebel. Gregory Tony served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (For image see DE#6 ) (drz) Modified File date on 8/31/2021 (drz). (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Berl Zwiebel. Berl Zwiebel served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Montgomery, Kristen) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Diane Montgomery on behalf of Berl Zwiebel (Montgomery, Kristen) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Gregory Tony. (drz) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gregory Tony. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14958929, filed by Berl Zwiebel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Citron, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth David Haimovitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Lawrence Ferguson