This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 07:16:59 (UTC).

Zutoft v. Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Zutoft filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06344

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Zutoft

Defendant

Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mario Kris Kasalo

Attorney at The Law Office of M. Kris Kasalo, Ltd.

20 North Clark Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer J. Kalas

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

322 Indianapolis Blvd, Suire 201`

Schererville, IN 46375

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) LETTER from Ray Riley. (Envelope postmarked 12/15/2020) (ph, ) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 12/26/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer J. Kalas for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/10/2020 at 01:45 PM. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 #7 (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. by Jennifer J. Kalas (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Zutoft as to Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 1/6/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/30/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Zutoft by Mario Kris Kasalo (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Robert Zutoft; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17580297. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER from Ray Riley. (Envelope postmarked 12/15/2020) (ph, ) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 12/26/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer J. Kalas for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/10/2020 at 01:45 PM. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 #7 (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. by Jennifer J. Kalas (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Zutoft as to Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Nationwide Credit and Collection, Inc. (acm, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 1/6/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/30/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Zutoft by Mario Kris Kasalo (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Robert Zutoft; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17580297. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less