This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:11:08 (UTC).

Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd. et al v. Guangzhou Youduo Plastics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Zuru Singapore PTE , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Guangzhou Youduo Plastics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08102

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.

ZURU Inc.

ZURU LLC

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A hereto

Guangzhou Youduo Plastics Co., Ltd.

Hangzhou KUOSHI Imp&Exp Co., Ltd.

lightinthebox

Shanghai Hou Zhen Trading Co., Ltd.

Shanghai Joan Industrial Co., Ltd.

Shantou Hongtian Environmental Protection Technology Co., Ltd.

Shantou Penyo Culture Technology Co., Ltd.

shenzhen sanyoo unicom Technology Co.,Ltd

Taizhou Union Time Imp&Exp Co., Ltd.

Wenzhou Wonderland Packaging Products Co., Ltd.

abuahmad89

auto121

bestservicephone8819

creative.purchase

discounts_center

ec_home

191 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R. Yellin

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C. (Hackensack)

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Harry J Moren

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

Other Attorneys

Lydia Pittaway

Attorney at Pittaway Law, PLLC

133 South 2Nd Street, Ste 101

Fort Pierce, FL 34950

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman LLP

1 Penn Plz, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#170

(#170) MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice #167 Motion for Default Judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Motion DENTED without prejudice. Plaintiffs did not follow the procedures in Attachment A of the undersigned's Tndividual Practices in Civil Cases. No proposed order to show cause for default judgment or proposed default judgment were filed. The Court previously reminded Plaintiff that any motion must comply with the Court's individual practices. See Endorsement, Dkt. 166. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at docket entry 167. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/24/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#169

(#169) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #167 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants on First Amended Schedule A. . Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

168 #7

Exhibit 7 (Clerk's Certificate of Default)

168 #5

Exhibit 5 (Service E-mail)

168 #4

Exhibit 4 (Return of Service)

168 #3

Exhibit 3 (TRO)

168 #1

Exhibit 1 (Amended Schedule A)

168 #168

Main Document

#167

(#167) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants on First Amended Schedule A. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Schedule A

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (Copyright Registration)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (Trademark Registration)

1 #1

Main Document

199 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice #167 Motion for Default Judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Motion DENTED without prejudice. Plaintiffs did not follow the procedures in Attachment A of the undersigned's Tndividual Practices in Civil Cases. No proposed order to show cause for default judgment or proposed default judgment were filed. The Court previously reminded Plaintiff that any motion must comply with the Court's individual practices. See Endorsement, Dkt. 166. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at docket entry 167. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/24/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #167 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants on First Amended Schedule A. . Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) DECLARATION of Michael R. Yellin in Support re: #167 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants on First Amended Schedule A.. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Amended Schedule A), #2 Exhibit 2 (Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 (TRO), #4 Exhibit 4 (Return of Service), #5 Exhibit 5 (Service E-mail), #6 Exhibit 6 (Service Website), #7 Exhibit 7 (Clerk's Certificate of Default)).(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants on First Amended Schedule A. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 41(a)(1)(i),Plaintiffs ZURU (SINGAPORE) PTE, LTD, ZURU LLC and ZURU INC. (collectively "Plaintiffs") voluntarily dismiss the following Defendants listed on Schedule A to the Complaint without prejudice: Daflly and Satcal Direct. The cases against Defendants Daflly and Satcal Direct are hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Defendants Daflly and Satcal Direct. SO ORDERED., ( Daflly and Satcal Direct terminated.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/17/21) (yv) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #161 Declaration, filed by ZURU LLC, ZURU Inc., Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd. ENDORSEMENT : The Court reminds Plaintiff that any motion for default judgments to be entered against certain Defendants must conform with the procedures included in Attachment A in the undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/17/21) (yv) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to First Amended Schedule A.(km) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Holland, Andrew) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/17/2021 (km). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #162 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Valerie E. Caproni for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Daflly, Satcal Direct. Document filed by ZURU Inc., Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd., ZURU LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Holland, Andrew) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***EX-PARTE***REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Schedule A by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Seal Schedule A to Complaint and Exhibit 2 to Drysdale Declaration. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Brief)).(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Michael R. Yellin in Support re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (January 2011 Mark Monitor report), #2 Exhibit 2 (IP Rights Seizures Statistics Report), #3 Exhibit 3 (BASCAP Report), #4 Exhibit 4 (ICANN Registrar Accreditation Agreement), #5 Exhibit 5 (Hague Convention on Service Abroad), #6 Exhibit 6 (Translation of Civil Procedure Law of the People's Republic of China)).(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Stephen Drysdale in Support re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Copyright and Trademark Registration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Screenshot Printouts - Redacted)).(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd.. Related Document Number: #1 ..(Yellin, Michael) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC, Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd...(Yellin, Michael) Modified on 9/30/2021 (lb). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Yellin, Michael) Modified on 9/30/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A hereto. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25130076)Document filed by Zuru (Singapore) PTE., Ltd., ZURU LLC, ZURU Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Trademark Registration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Copyright Registration), #3 Exhibit Schedule A).(Yellin, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lydia Pittaway