This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2019 at 07:10:09 (UTC).

Zuru LLC v. Lego Systems Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Zuru LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Lego Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZURU LLC

Defendants

Lego Systems Inc

Lego Juris A-S

Lego A-S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M Koide

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett and Ludwig PLLC

8300 Boone Boulevard Suite 550

Vienna, VA 22182

Thomas M Dunlap

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett and Ludwig PLLC

8300 Boone Boulevard Suite 550

Vienna, VA 22182

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett and Ludwig PLLC

55 East Monroe Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Lisa Tan

Attorney at Russakow and Tan LLP

790 East Green Street

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey B Bell

Attorney at Hill Farrer and Burrill LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

William A White

Attorney at Hill Farrer and Burrill LLP

One California Plaza, 300 South Grand Avenue 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #5

Proposed Order Granting Defendant Lego Systems, Inc.S Ex Parte Application for F

18 #4

Exhibit A to William A. White Declaration

18 #3

Declaration of William A. White

18 #2

Exhibit A to Jeffrey B. Bell Declaration

18 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey B. Bell

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/15/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 #18 filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/15/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Bell, #2 Exhibit A to Jeffrey B. Bell Declaration, #3 Declaration of William A. White, #4 Exhibit A to William A. White Declaration, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Lego Systems, Inc.S Ex Parte Application for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint) (Bell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc, identifying ZURU LLC; ZURU, Inc.; LEGO Systems, Inc.; LEGO A/S; LEGO Juris A/S; KIRKBI A/S; KIRKBI Invest A/S. (Bell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc identifying LEGO A/S; KIRKBI A/S as Corporate Parent. (Bell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lego Systems Inc answer now due 3/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc.(Attorney Jeffrey B Bell added to party Lego Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Bell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN ASPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #12 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Thomas M. Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC, designating Lisa Tan as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. #12 filed on January 10, 2019 is stricken for failure to comply with this Court's standing order and Local Rule 5-4.4.2 which require that proposed orders be submitted to chambers email. Additionally the proposed order attached to the document does not provide the address of the local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23025973) filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Lisa Tan added to party Zuru LLC(pty:pla)) (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC, identifying ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M Dunlap. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant Lego A-S, #2 Summons for Defendant Lego Juris A-S) (et) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23001505 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ZURU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Attorney Brian M Koide added to party ZURU LLC(pty:pla))(Koide, Brian) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less