This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2023 at 09:58:57 (UTC).

Zuru LLC et al v. LEGO Juris A/S

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Zuru LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LEGO Juris A/S. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-MC-00102

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zuru LLC

228 Nevada Street

El Segundo, CA 90245

Zuru Inc.

92 Grandville Road, Tsim Sha Tsui East

Defendant

LEGO Juris A/S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fatima Lahnin

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH

195 Church St. 18Th Floor, Po Box 1950

New Haven, CT 06509-1950

John R. Horvack, Jr.

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH

195 Church St. 18Th Floor, Po Box 1950

New Haven, CT 06509-1950

Damian K. Gunningsmith

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH

195 Church St. 18Th Floor, Po Box 1950

New Haven, CT 06509-1950

Defendant Attorneys

Andraya Pulaski Brunau

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-Htfd-CT

242 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103-1212

Elizabeth Ann Alquist

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-Trmbl St Htfd-CT

242 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103-1212

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Exhibit 1

22 #22

Main Document

21 #25

Exhibit 24

21 #22

Exhibit 21

21 #13

Exhibit 12

21 #12

Exhibit 11

21 #7

Exhibit 6

21 #2

Exhibit 1

#20

(#20) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC.Responses due by 2/14/2023 (Lahnin, Fatima) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Horvack, Jr on behalf of Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Horvack, John) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/20/2022.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#17) ORDER: Zuru's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby GRANTED, subject to the condition that Lego Juris A/S's response deadline to the Motion for Sanctions before the TTAB has been extended by two weeks. See Zuru Reply (ECF No. #16 ) at 2 n.2. If the deadline for Lego Juris A/S's response is extended by two weeks, Zuru shall respond to Lego Juris A/S's Motion for Protective Order and to Terminate the Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(3)(A) (ECF No. #1 ) by January 24, 2023. If the deadline is not extended, Zuru shall respond by January 10, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 01/06/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Memorandum in Opposition and Reply in Support re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Motion for Protective Order and To Terminate The Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175745), #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed by LEGO Juris A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 1) filed by Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Fatima Lahnin, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(Lahnin, Fatima) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC.Responses due by 2/14/2023 (Lahnin, Fatima) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #1 Motion for Protective Order and To Terminate The Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. Responses due by 1/24/2023. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: Based on the representations in Zuru's Request for Clarification of Court's Order re: Extension of Time (ECF No. #18 ), Zuru's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby GRANTED. Zuru shall respond to Lego Juris A/S's Motion for Protective Order and to Terminate the Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(3)(A) (ECF No. #1 ) by January 24, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 01/06/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE re 17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by Zuru Inc., Zuru LLCRequest for Clarification of Court's Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gunningsmith, Damian) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Zuru's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby GRANTED, subject to the condition that Lego Juris A/S's response deadline to the Motion for Sanctions before the TTAB has been extended by two weeks. See Zuru Reply (ECF No. #16 ) at 2 n.2. If the deadline for Lego Juris A/S's response is extended by two weeks, Zuru shall respond to Lego Juris A/S's Motion for Protective Order and to Terminate the Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(3)(A) (ECF No. #1 ) by January 24, 2023. If the deadline is not extended, Zuru shall respond by January 10, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 01/06/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/24/2023 to Respond to Motion for Protective Order and to Terminate Deposition filed by Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC. (Gunningsmith, Damian) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/5/2023.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Memorandum in Opposition re #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/24/2023 to Respond to Motion for Protective Order and to Terminate Deposition filed by LEGO Juris A/S. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEGO Juris A/S identifying Corporate Parent KIRKBI Invest A/S for LEGO Juris A/S. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Case by LEGO Juris A/S (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andraya Pulaski Brunau on behalf of LEGO Juris A/S (Brunau, Andraya) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Damian K. Gunningsmith on behalf of Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Gunningsmith, Damian) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Fatima Lahnin on behalf of Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Lahnin, Fatima) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Horvack, Jr on behalf of Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Horvack, John) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/20/2022.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketJudge Sarala V. Nagala added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Memorandum in Support re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Motion for Protective Order and To Terminate The Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175745) filed by LEGO Juris A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoena Motion for Protective Order and To Terminate The Deposition of Melanie J. Raubeson, Esq. (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175745), filed by LEGO Juris A/S.Responses due by 1/10/2023 (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less