This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:05:31 (UTC).

Zurn Industries, LLC. v. MiFab, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Zurn Industries, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MiFab, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06425

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Zurn Industries, LLC.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

MiFab, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Osseiran

Kristin Graham Noel

Michael T Piery

Piery T. Michael

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

John Randolph Worth

Craig Robert Bucki

James R. O'Connor

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant MiFab, Inc., Defendant MiFab, Inc. by James R. O'Connor (O'Connor, James) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#21

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney James O'Connor's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #20 is granted. He is directed to file his appearance on the record. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20224100. (O'Connor, James) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#19

(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant MiFab, Inc., Defendant MiFab, Inc. by Craig Robert Bucki (Bucki, Craig) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney Craig Bucki's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #17 is granted. He is directed to file an appearance on the record. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

17 #1

Appendix Bar Admission Dates

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Response to counterclaims due by 1/18/23. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 1/25/2023. The report should include a proposed case management schedule consistent with the Court's local patent rules and reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MiFab, Inc. (Worth, John) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#4

(#4) Notification of Affiliates by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - August 6, 2021 Letter

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - MiFab Product Information

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,006,449

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,784,242

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant MiFab, Inc., Defendant MiFab, Inc. by James R. O'Connor (O'Connor, James) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney James O'Connor's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #20 is granted. He is directed to file his appearance on the record. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20224100. (O'Connor, James) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant MiFab, Inc., Defendant MiFab, Inc. by Craig Robert Bucki (Bucki, Craig) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney Craig Bucki's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #17 is granted. He is directed to file an appearance on the record. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20208195. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Bar Admission Dates)(Bucki, Craig) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Response to counterclaims due by 1/18/23. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 1/25/2023. The report should include a proposed case management schedule consistent with the Court's local patent rules and reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MiFab, Inc. (Worth, John) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by MiFab, Inc. against Zurn Industries, LLC. . by MiFab, Inc.(Worth, John) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MiFab, Inc. by John Randolph Worth (Worth, John) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20121186. (Michael, Piery) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zurn Industries, LLC. by Stephen Osseiran (Osseiran, Stephen) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zurn Industries, LLC. by Kristin Graham Noel (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notification of Affiliates by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Zurn Industries, LLC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20055445. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,784,242, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,006,449, #3 Exhibit 3 - MiFab Product Information, #4 Exhibit 4 - August 6, 2021 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Claim Chart)(Noel, Kristin) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less