This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 08:17:51 (UTC).

Zurich Insurance PLC v. Austin Rig & Crate LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Zurich Insurance PLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Austin Rig Crate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01354

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zurich Insurance PLC

Defendant

Austin Rig & Crate LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert C. Oliver

Attorney at Sharpe & Oliver, LLP

5535 Memorial Drive, No. F570

Houston, TX 77007

Martin F Casey

Attorney at Casey & Barnett, LLC

305 Boradway, Suite 1202

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Austin Rig & Crate LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28091968) filed by Zurich Insurance PLC.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zurich Insurance PLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Martin F. Casey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zurich Insurance PLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2022. (Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Martin F. Casey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#9

(#9) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Austin Rig & Crate LLC filed by Zurich Insurance PLC.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#12

(#12) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Austin Rig & Crate LLC filed by Zurich Insurance PLC.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Martin F. Casey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Martin F. Casey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zurich Insurance PLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2022. (Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zurich Insurance PLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Austin Rig & Crate LLC, filed.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Austin Rig & Crate LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28091968) filed by Zurich Insurance PLC.(Oliver, Robert) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Oliver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin F. Casey