This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:29:42 (UTC).

ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD v. TRAILER TRANSIT, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD filed an Other lawsuit against TRAILER TRANSIT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie L. Haines. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie L. Haines

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD

Defendants

TRAILER TRANSIT, INC.

FRANKIE HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel C. Theveny

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Mark E. Utke

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER re #10 Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD - Plaintiff, Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, as subrogee of Cirque du solei Holding L.P. et/al, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), hereby dismisses this action with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 10/12/2021. (dlg) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD (Theveny, Daniel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Daniel C. Theveny to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 9/20/2021. (dlg) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 09/16/2021. (dag) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. TRAILER TRANSIT, INC. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (kss) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #4

Certificate of Service

4 #3

Proposed Order

4 #2

Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Frankie Hill

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #10 Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD - Plaintiff, Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, as subrogee of Cirque du solei Holding L.P. et/al, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), hereby dismisses this action with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 10/12/2021. (dlg) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD (Theveny, Daniel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Daniel C. Theveny to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 9/20/2021. (dlg) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Affidavit of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 09/16/2021. (dag) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. TRAILER TRANSIT, INC. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (kss) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Natalie Smith/Front Desk Admin for Trailer Transit, Inc. on 9/13/2021 @ 11:28 a.m., filed by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. (Theveny, Daniel) Document removed from public view and refiled at #8 . Modified text on 9/16/2021. (kss) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for attorney Daniel C. Theveny to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Plaintiff, Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, as subrogee of Cirque du solei Holding L.P. et\al (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6689531) by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Theveny, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. (Utke, Mark) Modified text on 9/3/2021 to change corporate parent to none. (kss) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2021. (kss) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FRANKIE HILL, TRAILER TRANSIT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Frankie Hill) (kss) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FRANKIE HILL, TRAILER TRANSIT, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6687574), filed by ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kss) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel C. Theveny

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E. Utke