Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2021 at 09:21:21 (UTC).

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. MCLANE COMPANY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against MCLANE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joy Flowers Conti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joy Flowers Conti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Claimants

MCLANE COMPANY, INC.

WEST PENN POWER COMPANY

CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

WEST PENN POWER COMPANY

CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark E. Utke

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Mark T. Mullen

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, One Liberty Place, Philadelphia

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Grant H Hackley

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson LLP

Henry W. Oliver Bldg., 535 Smithfield St., Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Gary N. Stewart

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson

240 N. Third Street, Payne Shoemaker Building, 9Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Kathryn M. Kenyon

Attorney at Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 1300

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Complaint #15 2ND AMENDED OF PLAINTIFF, CROSSCLAIM against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WEST PENN POWER COMPANY by MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) Modified on 4/12/2021 (ma). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #14 Motion of Attorney Mark T. Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/12/2021. (map) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#24

(#24) REPLY to #21 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, filed by WEST PENN POWER COMPANY. (Kenyon, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#23

(#23) Summons Issued as to CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC (ma) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#22

(#22) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WEST PENN POWER COMPANY by MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#15

(#20) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and, CROSSCLAIM against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC by WEST PENN POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kenyon, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

14 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#14

(#25) ORDER granting #14 Motion of Attorney Mark T. Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/12/2021. (map) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant H Hackley on behalf of MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (Hackley, Grant) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary N. Stewart on behalf of MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for McLane Company-CT Corporation on 2/25/2021, filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying Zurich Insurance Group as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to MCLANE COMPANY, INC., WEST PENN POWER COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MCLANE COMPANY, INC., WEST PENN POWER COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6358815), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Complaint #15 2ND AMENDED OF PLAINTIFF, CROSSCLAIM against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WEST PENN POWER COMPANY by MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) Modified on 4/12/2021 (ma). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #14 Motion of Attorney Mark T. Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/12/2021. (map) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to #21 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, filed by WEST PENN POWER COMPANY. (Kenyon, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Summons Issued as to CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC (ma) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WEST PENN POWER COMPANY by MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and, CROSSCLAIM against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC by WEST PENN POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kenyon, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant H Hackley on behalf of MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.. (Hackley, Grant) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary N. Stewart on behalf of MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. WEST PENN POWER COMPANY served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. (Stewart, Gary) Modified on 3/5/2021 (ma). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant H Hackley on behalf of MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (Hackley, Grant) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary N. Stewart on behalf of MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (Stewart, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUpdate Answer Deadline: Answer due from MCLANE COMPANY, INC. on 3/18/2021 (ma) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for McLane Company-CT Corporation on 2/25/2021, filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying Zurich Insurance Group as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Utke, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MCLANE COMPANY, INC., WEST PENN POWER COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MCLANE COMPANY, INC., WEST PENN POWER COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6358815), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST PENN POWER CO is a litigant

Latest cases where McLane Foodservice, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant