This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2020 at 11:44:15 (UTC).

Zuppardo v. General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Zuppardo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy B Vitter and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01596

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy B Vitter

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Zuppardo

Defendants

General Motors, LLC

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Collins Dalton

Attorney at Richard C. Dalton, L.L.C.

1343 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant Attorney

Margaret A. Cassisa

Attorney at Bernard, Cassisa, Elliott & Davis, APLC (Metairie)

3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 3050

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 8/3/2020 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#12

(#12) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC (Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.Attorney Margaret A. Cassisa added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft).(Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 8) be STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with the Court's June 5, 2020 Order (R. Doc. 4), and the Court's June 10, 2020 Order (R. Doc. 7). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/11/2020.(jeg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#8

(#8) **STRICKEN per Order rec doc 9** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (jeg). Modified on 6/12/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 5) be STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with the Courts June 5, 2020 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/10/2020.(jeg) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#5

(#5) **STRICKEN per Order rec doc 7** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) Modified on 6/10/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/5/2020.(jeg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (jeg) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8332103) filed by Joseph Zuppardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Joseph Zuppardo(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 8/3/2020 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC (Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.Attorney Margaret A. Cassisa added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft).(Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 8) be STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with the Court's June 5, 2020 Order (R. Doc. 4), and the Court's June 10, 2020 Order (R. Doc. 7). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/11/2020.(jeg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **STRICKEN per Order rec doc 9** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (jeg). Modified on 6/12/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 5) be STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with the Courts June 5, 2020 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/10/2020.(jeg) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Amended Complaint. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section D Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate 3 Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **STRICKEN per Order rec doc 7** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) Modified on 6/10/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/5/2020.(jeg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (jeg) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8332103) filed by Joseph Zuppardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Joseph Zuppardo(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less