This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 08:22:16 (UTC).

Zuniga Gonzalez v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Zuniga Gonzalez filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01746

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Zuniga Gonzalez

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aliaksandra Valitskaya

Attorney at Romano Stancroff PC

360 North Pacific Coast Highway Suite 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

Timothy Michael Whelan

Attorney at Romano Stancroff PC

360 North Pacific Coasth Highway Suite 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

Mark P Romano

Attorney at Romano Stancroff PC

360 North Pacific Coast Highway Suite 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Sharon Zuniga Gonzalez.. (Romano, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Sharon Zuniga Gonzalez.. (Romano, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2020-01153735-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28050414 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Sharon Zuniga Gonzalez.. (Romano, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Sharon Zuniga Gonzalez.. (Romano, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed in State Court on 9/8/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sharon Zuniga Gonzalez. Filed in State Court on 8/4/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2020-01153735-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28050414 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less