This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

Zuiderveen v. Bayer-Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Zuiderveen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer-Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Janet T. Neff. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01022

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randall L. Zuiderveen

Defendant

Bayer-Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brion Bannon Doyle

Attorney at Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bayer-Monsanto Company (mg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer-Monsanto Company filed by Randall L. Zuiderveen (Doyle, Brion) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doyle, Brion) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT from California Northern District, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:20-cv-00582 (ndj) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California (mg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bayer-Monsanto Company (mg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doyle, Brion) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Bayer-Monsanto Company (none provided) (mg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Randall L. Zuiderveen in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4678881 (Doyle, Brion) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer-Monsanto Company filed by Randall L. Zuiderveen (Doyle, Brion) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.