This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 07:35:37 (UTC).

Zubic Drago v. Mandarich Law Group LLP et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Zubic Drago filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Mandarich Law Group LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60493

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zubic Drago

Defendant

Mandarich Law Group LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew David Bavaro

Attorney at Loan Lawyers

3201 Griffin Road, Suite 100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

Stephanie R. Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm APC

3500 West Olive Avenue Suite 300

Burbank,, CA 91505

Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center PA

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Defendant Attorney

June D. Coleman

Attorney at Messer Strickler Ltd

5960 South Land Park Drive Suite 1059

Sacramento, CA 95822

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CONSOLIDATE the above-captioned matter with the case Zubic Drago v. LVNV Funding, LLC, Case No. 21-61716-CIV-SMITH (S.D. Fla.). All subsequent filings shall be in that numbered case only and bear Case No. 21-61716-CIV-SMITH. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#56

(#56) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/27/2022. Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#52

(#52) (WITHDRAWN PER DE# 55 ) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob) Modified Text on 4/22/2022 (cds). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#51

(#51) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#50

(#50) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney June D. Coleman, Thomas J. Lyons, Jr, and Stephanie R. Tatar, mailing date March 7, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

48 #1

*Restricted*

48 #48

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#47

No Description Available

46 #1

Request for Judicial Notice

46 #46

Main Document

#44

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

42 #1

Proposed Order

42 #42

Main Document

#41

No Description Available

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CONSOLIDATE the above-captioned matter with the case Zubic Drago v. LVNV Funding, LLC, Case No. 21-61716-CIV-SMITH (S.D. Fla.). All subsequent filings shall be in that numbered case only and bear Case No. 21-61716-CIV-SMITH. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/27/2022. Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) PAPERLESS ORDER withdrawing the Court's #52 Order to Show Cause. The Court held a 54 Telephonic Status Conference on April 21, 2022 and Plaintiff's counsel showed good cause for the parties' failure to comply with the Court's #51 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/21/2022. (ob) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docket(#54) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/21/2022. Attorney Appearance(s): Matthew David Bavaro, Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#53) PAPERLESS ORDER setting telephonic status conference for Thursday, April 21, 2022 at 4:30 P.M. The parties are instructed to call 1-877-402-9753 by no later than 4:25 P.M. The access code is 9372453 and the password is 0918. The Court requires that the parties appear via a landline (i.e., not a cellular phone or a speaker phone) if possible for clarity. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/18/2022. (ob) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) (WITHDRAWN PER DE# 55 ) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob) Modified Text on 4/22/2022 (cds). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney June D. Coleman, Thomas J. Lyons, Jr, and Stephanie R. Tatar, mailing date March 7, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#49) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-02606. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant LVNV Funding LLC. (car) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mandarich Law Group LLP. (car) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Zubic Drago. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zubic Drago, (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Zubic Drago. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Zubic Drago. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30985455 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Zubic Drago. (Attorney Stephanie R. Tatar added to party Zubic Drago(pty:pla))(Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer June D. Coleman