This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2021 at 09:08:15 (UTC).

ZTE (USA) Inc v. WSOU Investments LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 ZTE USA Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against WSOU Investments LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02128

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZTE (USA) Inc

Defendants

WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lionel Marks Lavenue

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP

1875 Explorer Street, Suite 800

Reston, VA 20190

Bradford C Schulz

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunbar LLP

1875 Explorer St, Suite 800

Reston, VA 20190

Everett McClyde Upshaw

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC

1204 Gano Street

Dallas, TX 75231

Keana Theresa Taylor

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC

1204 Gano Street

Dallas, TX 75215

Defendant Attorney

Travis Lee Richins

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff WSOUs Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice, Or Alternatively, Opposed Motion To Stay filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice, or In The Alternative, To Stay Brief In Support, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff ZTEs Motion For Leave To File Sur-Reply In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative To Stay) (Upshaw, Everett) Modified text on 11/5/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY filed by WSOU Investments LLC re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Under First to File Rule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I) (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed by ZTE (USA) Inc re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Under First to File Rule (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay) (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Taylor, Keana) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Everett McClyde Upshaw on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to appoint local counsel, in accordance with Local Rule 83.10, by October 25, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/24/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by WSOU Investments LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Under First to File Rule (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1) (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Under First to File Rule filed by WSOU Investments LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Travis Lee Richins added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:dft) (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (jmg) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to WSOU Investments LLC. (jmg) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZTE (USA) Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ZTE Corporation for ZTE (USA) Inc. (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12197234) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20, #21 Exhibit(s) 21, #22 Exhibit(s) 22, #23 Cover Sheet) (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZTE (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis Lee Richins