This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 11:21:26 (UTC).

ZS Pharma, Inc. et al v. Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 ZS Pharma, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory B. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01099

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory B. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZS Pharma, Inc.

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Defendants

Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Hetero Drugs Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel O'Boyle

Hassen Sayeed

James Y. Li

Defendant Attorneys

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to complaint to November 2, 2022 - filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#16

(#16) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,406,662 . (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

15 #2

Exhibit N-Q

15 #1

Exhibit A-M

15 #15

Main Document

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#20

(#17) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Coordination and Extension of Deadline for Case Schedule by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

6 #1

Summons Issued Hetero Drugs Ltd

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc. filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc. (smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

4 #2

Patent/Trademark Report 3

4 #1

Patent/Trademark Report 2

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than July 18, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/18/2025. (smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to complaint to November 2, 2022 filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/19/22. (ntl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (20 in 1:22-cv-01100-GBW, 19 in 1:22-cv-01096-GBW, 17 in 1:22-cv-01099-GBW, 20 in 1:22-cv-01055-GBW, 20 in 1:22-cv-01101-GBW) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Coordination and Extension of Deadline for Case Schedule filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/18/22. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01055-GBW, 1:22-cv-01096-GBW, 1:22-cv-01099-GBW, 1:22-cv-01100-GBW, 1:22-cv-01101-GBW (ntl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to complaint to November 2, 2022 - filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Coordination and Extension of Deadline for Case Schedule by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,406,662 . (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hetero Drugs Ltd.- filed by ZS Pharma, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N-Q)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docket(#14) ORAL ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order in this action consistent with the applicable form Scheduling Order of Judge Williams, which is posted at http://www/ded/uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Williams, Forms), along with a cover letter requesting the Court to enter the joint proposed Scheduling Order (if there are no disputes or other issues concerning scheduling that the Court needs to address) or to schedule the Scheduling Conference. If there are disputes or other issues the Court needs to address in the joint proposed Scheduling Order, in the cover letter, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in the joint proposed Scheduling Order which those appear. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/4/22. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01101-GBW, 1:22-cv-01055-GBW, 1:22-cv-01099-GBW (ntl) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney James Y. Li for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and ZS Pharma, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01055-GBW, 1:22-cv-01096-GBW, 1:22-cv-01099-GBW, 1:22-cv-01100-GBW, 1:22-cv-01101-GBW(mpb) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Service for Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc. by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 8/24/2022. (etg) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01096-VAC, 1:22-cv-01099-VAC, 1:22-cv-01100-VAC, 1:22-cv-01101-VAC (rjb) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 8/22/2022; Hetero Drugs Ltd. on 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Hetero Drugs Ltd)(smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc. filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, ZS Pharma, Inc. (smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attached. (Attachments: #1 Patent/Trademark Report 2, #2 Patent/Trademark Report 3)(smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than July 18, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/18/2025. (smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Ascent Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hetero Drugs Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3942066.) - filed by ZS Pharma, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less