This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:03:05 (UTC).

Zorn v. City of Goose Creek et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Zorn filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against City of Goose Creek. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Bristow Marchant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03445

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

Referral Judge

Bristow Marchant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alicia Zorn

Defendants

Officer T Cowee

City of Goose Creek

Officer Xavier Reyes

South Carolina Police Department

Officer C Moree

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey S Weathers

Attorney at Jeffrey S Weathers Law Office

Po Box 755

Moncks Corner, SC 29461

Defendant Attorney

Drew Hamilton Butler

Attorney at Richardson Plowden and Robinson PA

Po Box 21203

Charleston, SC 29413

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by City of Goose Creek.(Butler, Drew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Alicia Zorn.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/23/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Weathers, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 2/5/2020 (hada, ). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-08-2770. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8822829), filed by C Moree, City of Goose Creek, Xavier Reyes, T Cowee, South Carolina Police Department. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (egra, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#12

(#12) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/20/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/30/2020, Discovery due by 8/17/2020, Motions due by 10/30/2020, Mediation Due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/13/2020. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Goose Creek, T Cowee, C Moree.(Butler, Drew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alicia Zorn.(Weathers, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant South Carolina Police Department is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by South Carolina Police Department. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Butler, Drew) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/13/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 12/13/2019 to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user (egra, ). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/10/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/10/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/10/2020, Discovery due by 6/10/2020, Motions due by 8/10/2020, Mediation Due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 12/16/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Goose Creek, T Cowee, C Moree, Xavier Reyes, South Carolina Police Department. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Xavier Reyes.(Butler, Drew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant South Carolina Police Department is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/20/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/30/2020, Discovery due by 8/17/2020, Motions due by 10/30/2020, Mediation Due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/13/2020. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by City of Goose Creek.(Butler, Drew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/10/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/10/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/10/2020, Discovery due by 6/10/2020, Motions due by 8/10/2020, Mediation Due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 12/16/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alicia Zorn.(Weathers, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Alicia Zorn.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/23/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Weathers, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 2/5/2020 (hada, ). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by South Carolina Police Department. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Butler, Drew) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/13/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 12/13/2019 to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user (egra, ). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Xavier Reyes.(Butler, Drew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Goose Creek, T Cowee, C Moree.(Butler, Drew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Goose Creek, T Cowee, C Moree, Xavier Reyes, South Carolina Police Department. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-08-2770. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8822829), filed by C Moree, City of Goose Creek, Xavier Reyes, T Cowee, South Carolina Police Department. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (egra, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.