This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 16:14:47 (UTC).

Zordani v. Heartland Payment Systems, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Zordani filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. Reid Neureiter and Lewis T. Babcock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01656

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

Presiding Judge

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Zordani

Defendant

Heartland Payment Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

April Rheaume

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua J. Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Nathan David Chapman

Attorney at Kabat Chapman & Ozmer LLP

171 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/04/2020. (slibi, ) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#16

(#16) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/4/2020. Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021. Proposed Protective Orders due 8/12/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, ) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#15

(#15) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 July 2020. It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Telephonic Appearance at Scheduling Conference #12 is GRANTED. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/28/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#11

(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tom Zordani. (Rheaume, April) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tom Zordani All parties do not consent.. (Rheaume, April) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Global Payments Inc. for Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC.(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. Heartland Payment Systems, LLC answer due 7/15/2020. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/21/2020. Status Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 06/09/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Heartland Payment Systems, LLC by Plaintiff Tom Zordani. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Heartland Payment Systems, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7330173)Attorney Joshua J. Sanford added to party Tom Zordani(pty:pla), filed by Tom Zordani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/04/2020. (slibi, ) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/4/2020. Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021. Proposed Protective Orders due 8/12/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, ) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 July 2020. It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Telephonic Appearance at Scheduling Conference #12 is GRANTED. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/28/2020. Text Only Entry (ebuch) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/28/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tom Zordani. (Rheaume, April) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE REASSIGNED, pursuant to #9 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01656-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 7/20/2020 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tom Zordani All parties do not consent.. (Rheaume, April) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Global Payments Inc. for Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC.(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. Heartland Payment Systems, LLC answer due 7/15/2020. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/21/2020. Status Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 06/09/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Heartland Payment Systems, LLC by Plaintiff Tom Zordani. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Heartland Payment Systems, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7330173)Attorney Joshua J. Sanford added to party Tom Zordani(pty:pla), filed by Tom Zordani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heartland Payment Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan David Chapman