This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:28:34 (UTC).

Zografidis v. Richards et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Zografidis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Richards. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred V. Covello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00631

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Konstantinos Zografidis

Norwalk, CT 06855

Defendants

CW-2

CW-1

Vanessa Richards

Michael Runowicz

Sarah Karwan

US Attorney Deirde M Daly

Deputy Ass. Attorney General-Criminal Division

Kenneth A. Blanco

Sandra Glover

Patrick Doherty

Peter Markle

John B. Hughes

William Nardini

John H. Durham

Dominick Cisero

Terrence Blake

Perez

Edwards

Mark Suda

26 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Konstantinos Zografidis. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Konstantinos Zografidis. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2022. Discovery due by 11/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2022. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/4/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Konstantinos Zografidis. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Konstantinos Zografidis. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/4/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2022. Discovery due by 11/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2022. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Konstantinos Zografidis. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Konstantinos Zografidis. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Edwards is a litigant

Latest cases where PEREZ is a litigant