This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2022 at 08:09:01 (UTC).

Zogenix, Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Zogenix, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apotex Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01232

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zogenix, Inc.

Zogenix International Ltd.

Defendants

Apotex Inc.

Apotex Corp.

Lupin Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Megan Elizabeth Dellinger

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SO ORDERED Granting #17 Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2022. (nms) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#18

(#18) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Inc.; Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation for Apotex Corp. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#17

(#17) Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#16

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#15

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint - filed by Lupin Limited. (Bilson, David) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#12

SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Limited answer due 11/14/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/20/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

6 #2

Summons Issued

6 #1

Summons Issued

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent UCB SA for Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc. filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,406,606 B2. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date of Expiration of Patent: 08/05/2037. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-2

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #16 has been replaced with a corrected version. The caption on the filing has been updated to reflect the correct case number. (nms) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SO ORDERED Granting #17 Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2022. (nms) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Limited answer due 11/28/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2022. (nms) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Inc.; Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation for Apotex Corp. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) [SEALED] DECLARATION of Roshan P. Shrestha, Ph.D re #15 Opening Brief in Support, by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/18/2022) (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2022. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint - filed by Lupin Limited. (Bilson, David) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Limited answer due 11/14/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/20/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and related papers served on Lupin Ltd. on September 29, 2022, filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George F. Pappas, Einar Stole, Thomas J. Sullivan, Tobias Ma, Alexa Hansen, Charles Hall and Jennifer D. Cieluch, filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George F. Pappas, Einar Stole, Thomas J. Sullivan, Tobias Ma, Alexa Hansen, Charles Hall and Jennifer D. Cieluch - filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Apotex Corp. on 9/21/2022; Apotex Inc. on 9/21/2022; Lupin Limited on 9/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent UCB SA for Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc. filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,406,606 B2. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date of Expiration of Patent: 08/05/2037. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Lupin Limited ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3964591.) - filed by Zogenix, Inc., Zogenix International Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less