This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:16:25 (UTC).

Zogenix, Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Zogenix, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apotex Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01252

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zogenix, Inc.

Zogenix International Ltd.

Defendants

Apotex Inc.

Apotex Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian A. Biggs

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

April Abele Isaacson

Denise Seastone Kraft

Attorney at Barnard, Mezzanotte, Pinnie, Seelaus & Kraft, LLP

1205 N. Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Erin E. Larson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kimberlynn B. Davis

Michael E. Furrow

Soumitra Deka

Stuart E. Pollack

Susan Krumplitsch

Defendant Attorney

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to complaint to November 29, 2021 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Withdrawal by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

12 #4

Certification of Kimberlynn B. Davis

12 #3

Certification of Michael E. Furrow

12 #2

Certification of April Abele Isaacson

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney April Abele Isaacson; Michael E. Furrow; and Kimberlynn B. Davis - filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of April Abele Isaacson, #3 Certification of Michael E. Furrow, #4 Certification of Kimberlynn B. Davis)(Kraft, Denise) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/13/2021) (kmd). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Denise Seastone Kraft (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to complaint to November 29, 2021 filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apotex Corp. answer due 11/29/2021; Apotex Inc. answer due 11/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/28/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to complaint to November 29, 2021 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Withdrawal by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys April Abele Isaacson and Kimberlynn B. Davis for Zogenix International Ltd. and Zogenix, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Michael E. Furrow for Zogenix International Ltd. and Zogenix, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney April Abele Isaacson; Michael E. Furrow; and Kimberlynn B. Davis filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/13/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Certification of Michael E. Furrow at D.I. #12 replaced with signed version per counsel's request. (kmd) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney April Abele Isaacson; Michael E. Furrow; and Kimberlynn B. Davis - filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of April Abele Isaacson, #3 Certification of Michael E. Furrow, #4 Certification of Kimberlynn B. Davis)(Kraft, Denise) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/13/2021) (kmd). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Denise Seastone Kraft (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Zogenix, Inc., Zogenix International Ltd.: For Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart Pollack, Susan Krumplitsch, and Soumitra Deka filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/1/2021. (nmf) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart Pollack, Susan Krumplitsch, and Soumitra Deka - filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Stuart Pollack, #3 Certification of Susan Krumplitsch, #4 Certification of Soumitra Deka)(Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Zogenix, Inc. for Zogenix International Ltd. filed by Zogenix International Ltd., Zogenix, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apotex Corp. on 8/31/2021. (smg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,603,290 B2 ;10,452,815 B2. (smg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 07/21/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 08/02/2037 & 05/29/2038 Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/20/2024. (smg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688990.) - filed by Zogenix, Inc., Zogenix International Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zogenix, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apotex Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch