This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2020 at 11:08:49 (UTC).

Zito et al v. Strata Equity Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Zito filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Strata Equity Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Margaret B Seymour and Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03808

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Margaret B Seymour

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Bermudez

Mark Shinn

Alvaro Sarmiento, Jr

Sara Zito

Defendants

Wendi Dami-Vazquez

Strata Equity Group Inc

Strata Audubon LLC

Strata Veridian LLC

Jacinta Williams

Conservice LLC

Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV

Attorney at The Steinberg Law Firm LLP

103 Grandview Drive

Summerville, SC 29483

Steven E Goldberg

Attorney at Steinberg Law Firm

Po Box 9

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Kendrick Bell

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Kevin A Hall

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

1221 Main Street, Suite 1600

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert Andrew Walden

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

5 Exchange Street, Po Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402

Peter George Siachos

Attorney at Gordon and Rees

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 2200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Victoria Therese Kepes

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#27

#24

#20

#19

18 #1

Exhibit A - Leases

#18

17 #3

Exhibit C - Bermudez Lease

17 #2

Exhibit B - Shinn Lease

17 #1

Exhibit A - Zito Lease

#13

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Documents

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV on behalf of Daniel Bermudez, Alvaro Sarmiento, Jr, Mark Shinn, Sara Zito (Quinn, Frederick) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to 2:20-cv-3808-BHH. Please use this case number on future filings. (vdru, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#25) Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Honorable Margaret B Seymour no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Andrew Walden on behalf of Conservice LLC (Walden, Robert) (Main Document 24 replaced on 12/15/2020) (vdru, ). Modified on 12/15/2020 to replace with corrected document as provided by the filer. (vdru, ). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time: It is ordered that Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' response to Defendant Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss are due on December 28, 2020. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/9/2020.(vdru, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Defendant Pinnacle Property Mamagement Services, LLC's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss by Daniel Bermudez, Alvaro Sarmiento, Jr, Mark Shinn, Sara Zito. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Quinn, Frederick) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel Bermudez, Alvaro Sarmiento, Jr, Mark Shinn, Sara Zito of Wendi Dami-Vazquez and Jacinta Williams (Quinn, Frederick) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Leases)No proposed order.(Frampton, Henry) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Conservice LLC, Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC, Strata Audubon LLC, Strata Equity Group Inc, Strata Veridian LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zito Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Shinn Lease, #3 Exhibit C - Bermudez Lease, #4 Exhibit D - Order 2003-214, #5 Exhibit E - Order 1999-307, #6 Exhibit F - Order 2000-436, #7 Exhibit G - Dictionary Definitions)No proposed order.(Frampton, Henry) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on extensions of time filed by Defendant Conservice, LLC on November 5, 2020 and November 17, 2020. Conservice first moves the court to recognize an extension of time to answer to November 23, 2020, that Plaintiff granted Conservice before the action was removed to this court. Conservice next moves for an extension of time to November 30, 2020, which will result in Conservice's answer or other response being due the same date as the other organizational Defendants. Defendant's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 15) is granted. Defendant's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 14) is denied as moot. Conservice LLC answer due 11/30/2020. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/18/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Conservice LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Hall on behalf of Conservice LLC (Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time: It is ordered that the Strata Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on November 30, 2020. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/4/2020.(vdru, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Strata Audubon LLC, Strata Equity Group Inc, Strata Veridian LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.(Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time : It is ordered that Defendant Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLCs response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on November 30, 2020. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/4/2020.(vdru, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Frampton, Henry) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Frampton, Henry) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC.(vdru, ) Modified on 11/2/2020 to correct filing date. (vdru, ). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (vdru, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-08-2090. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9441636), filed by Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Documents). (vdru, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conservice, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria Therese Kepes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Andrew Walden