This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 07:15:10 (UTC).

Zippo Manufacturing Company v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Zippo Manufacturing Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07120

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zippo Manufacturing Company

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Luckyl123

QH Lighter Store

Sanqiao Store

cy1442834334@gmail Store

lovejuggalo

Claire Life Store

Yuze Global SAFETY PROTECTI0N Supplies Store

China's Store

tuansaidianzi

Superbillion Store

OneLuckyGifts Store

USB lighter Store

Care for Driver

OULII Official Store

tliangliang

AHKUCI Store

GZRM Store

CUCI Store

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Kevin K. Tung

Attorney at Kevin Kerveng Tung, P.C.

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 3D

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#46

#45

#44

#41

38 #3

Exhibit A

38 #2

Declaration Ming Declaration

38 #1

Declaration Attorney Declaration

#38

#37

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/28/2021. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment against the defendants identified on Schedule A, with the exception of Defendant LEKRA DIRECT #41 is granted. Enter Final Judgment Order. Status hearing is reset for 3/22/2021 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). The parties shall file a joint status report by 3/15/2021 and the court will enter an appropriate order. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's Lekra Direct's motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), 12(b)(6) and 20(a)(2) #37 , #38 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 2/17/2021. Defendant to reply by 3/3/2021. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/7/2021 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #41 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/29/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MEMORANDUM by Zippo Manufacturing Company in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #41 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION by Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company for entry of default as to Certain Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company for default judgment as to Certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zippo Manufacturing Company as to certain defendants (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STATUS Report by Zippo Manufacturing Company (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION by Defendant Lekra Direct to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration Attorney Declaration, #2 Declaration Ming Declaration, #3 Exhibit A)(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION by Defendant Lekra Direct to dismiss (Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Zippo Manufacturing Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17699182. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zippo Manufacturing Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin K. Tung Esq.