This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2021 at 07:16:32 (UTC).

Zingg v. Ensite USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2021 Zingg filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ensite USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David J. Hale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Zingg

Defendant

Ensite USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank J. Mazzaferro

Joseph A. Fitapelli

Richard J. Burch

Defendant Attorneys

Don Fogel

Hannah B. Kembel

John T. Hays

John O. Sheller

Marlene C. Williams

Scott R. McLaughlin

 

Court Documents

#21

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

19 #5

Exhibit A (part 5) - Motion to Consolidate

19 #4

Exhibit A (part 4) - Motion to Consolidate

19 #3

Exhibit (part 3) - Motion to Consolidate

19 #2

Exhibit A (part 2) - Motion to Consolidate

19 #1

Exhibit A (part 1) - Motion to Consolidate

#19

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Summons Tendered

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Tolling

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Consent

1 #1

Exhibit A - Handbook Excerpts

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Defer by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1) - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A (part 2) - Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit A (part 3) - Motion to Consolidate, #4 Exhibit A (part 4) - Motion to Consolidate, #5 Exhibit A (part 5) - Motion to Consolidate) (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/2/2021 granting #13 Proposed Agreed Order. EnSite's deadline to file its response to the Complaint is 8/4/2021. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah B. Kembel on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Kembel, Hannah) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Agreed Order by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Sheller on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ronald Zingg. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/15/2021 granting #10 Motion for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #11 Motion for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3380810) by Plaintiff Ronald Zingg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Zingg. Ensite USA, Inc. served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/6/2021 granting #7 Motion for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3373436) by Plaintiff Ronald Zingg (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard J. Burch re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/9/2021. (KJA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph A. Fitapelli re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (KJA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Frank J. Mazzaferro re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (KJA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ensite USA, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ensite USA, Inc. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3362075, filed by Ronald Zingg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Handbook Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Tolling, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less