This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2022 at 08:48:50 (UTC).

Zimmerman v. Penn-Star Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Zimmerman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Penn-Star Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01174

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Zimmerman

Defendant

Penn-Star Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael N. Poli

Attorney at POLI, MOON & ZANE, PLLC

403 Hill Street

Reno, NV 89501

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Howard Ballin

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes LLP

170 South Green Valley Parkway, Suite 300

Henderson, NV 89012

Mitchell Resnick

Attorney at Resnick and Louis

8111 E Indian Bend Rd.

Scottsdale, AZ 85250

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Petition for Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Petition for Removal

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Penn-Star Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Penn-Star Insurance Company.. (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Tyler Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/9/2022.(Resnick, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Joseph Zimmerman.. (Poli, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joseph Zimmerman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Poli, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Joseph Zimmerman.. (Poli, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Joseph Zimmerman.. (Poli, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joseph Zimmerman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Poli, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Joseph Zimmerman.. (Poli, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/9/2022.(Resnick, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Tyler Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (TRW) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Penn-Star Insurance Company.. (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Penn-Star Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-853884-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6981491) by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Petition for Removal) (Resnick, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penn-Star Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Howard Ballin