This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 07:58:20 (UTC).

Zimmerman v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Zimmerman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Aetna Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan M. Azrack and Anne Y. Shields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04166

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramona Zimmerman

Defendant

Aetna Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eitan Nof

Attorney at Mandell & Santora

29 Broadway

Lynbrook, NY 11563

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory James Bennici

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

5Th Fl, 1055 Washington Blvd

Stamford, CT 06901

Patrick W. Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

1055 Washington Blvd

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 22, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/22/2021. (Minerva, Deanna) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Second) by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 22, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/20/2021. (Minerva, Deanna) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Begos on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Bennici on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramona Zimmerman. Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Nof, Eitan) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) which requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs. Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d)(3). (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ramona Zimmerman (Nof, Eitan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketYour proposed summons was not issued for the following reason: No name and address in the Plaintiff's attorney name and address section. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14689266 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Ramona Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nof, Eitan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory J. Bennici

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Walter Begos