This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/02/2021 at 15:28:34 (UTC).

Zimmerman, Inc et al v. Murphy Exploration & Production Co. et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Zimmerman, Inc filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Murphy Exploration Production Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Johnston and Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00068

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John Johnston

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Faith M. O'Connor

Dun O'Connor

Zimmerman, Inc

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Samson Resources Corp

Murphy Exploration & Production Co.

John Does 1-30

Murphy Oil Corporation

Samson Resources Company

Murphy Oil USA, Inc.

Cross Claimants, Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Murphy Exploration & Production Co.

Murphy Oil Corporation

Murphy Oil USA, Inc.

Ballard Petroleum Holdings, LLC

Poplar Resources LLC

3Rd Party Defendants, Cross Claimants, Counter Claimants and Cross Defendants

Ballard Petroleum Holdings, LLC

Poplar Resources LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

John Does 1-30

Ballard Petroleum Holdings, LLC

Poplar Resources LLC

Defendants, 3Rd Party Defendants, Counter Claimants and Cross Defendants

Samson Resources Company

Ballard Petroleum Holdings, LLC

Poplar Resources LLC

James Does 1-20

WR Grace & Co.

Grace Petroleum Corporation

Samson Resources Corporation

Samson Resources II, LLC

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D. Cok

Attorney at COK KINZLER PLLP

35 North Bozeman Avenue

Bozeman, MT 59715

Travis W. Kinzler

Attorney at COK KINZLER PLLP

35 North Bozeman Avenue

Bozeman, MT 59715

Kyle W. Nelson

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Jonathan M. Cok

Attorney at COK KINZLER PLLP

35 North Bozeman Avenue

Bozeman, MT 59715

Richard J. Angell

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S. Main Street, One Utah Center

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Trent M. Gardner

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

J. Michael Bailey

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S. Main Street, One Utah Center

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant, Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Robert L. Sterup

Attorney at BROWN LAW FIRM, P.C. - BILLINGS

315 North 24Th Street, Po Box 849

Billings, MT 59103-0849

Scott M. DuBoff

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

1000 Potomac Street, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20007

John Ray Nelson

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

618 W. Riverside Ave, #300

Spokane, WA 99201

Leonard H. Smith

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

David R. West

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

1111 Third Ave, 30Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Randy J. Cox

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

Christopher Lee Decker

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

James A. Patten

Attorney at PATTEN PETERMAN BEKKEDAHL & GREEN

2817 Second Ave North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

Adam M. Shaw

Attorney at BROWN LAW FIRM, P.C. - MISSOULA

269 W. Front Street, Suite A

Missoula, MT 59802

Shane Alexander MacIntyre

Attorney at BROWN LAW FIRM, P.C. - MISSOULA

269 W. Front Street, Suite A

Missoula, MT 59802

Defendant, Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Scott M. DuBoff

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

1000 Potomac Street, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20007

John Ray Nelson

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

618 W. Riverside Ave, #300

Spokane, WA 99201

Leonard H. Smith

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

David R. West

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

1111 Third Ave, 30Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#84

#83

#82

#81

#80

#79

#78

#77

76 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of David R. West

2 #2

Summons - Murphy Oil USA

#2

1 #6

Blank Summons - Samson Resources Company

1 #5

Blank Summons - Samson Resources Corp

1 #4

Blank Summons Murphy Oil USA

1 #3

Blank Summons - Murphy Oil Corporation

1 #2

Blank Summons - Murphy Exploration

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #83 Motion be, and is, GRANTED, and Samson Third-Party Defendants shall have through November 15, 2021 to serve a pleading responsive to, or a motion concerning, the Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/30/2021. (SLR) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #82 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, James A. Patten appearing for Third Party Defendants Grace Petroleum Corporation, Samson Resources Company, Samson Resources Corporation, Samson Resources II, LLC (Patten, James) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) ORDER: Third-Party Defendants GRACE PETROLEUM CORPORATION, SAMSON RESOURCES CORPORATION, SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY, and SAMSON RESOURCES II, LLC (Samson Third-Party Defendants), having filed a #81 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading until August 30, 2021, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion (ECF #81) be, and is, GRANTED, and Samson Third-Party Defendants shall have through August 30,2021 to serve a pleading responsive to, or a motion concerning, the Third-PartyComplaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/23/2021. (SLR) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, James A. Patten appearing for Third Party Defendants Grace Petroleum Corporation, Samson Resources Company, Samson Resources Corporation, Samson Resources II, LLC (Patten, James) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) re #77 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, #78 Letter re ECF Registration (West, David) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) (Smith, Leonard) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRemark: Counsel David West is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (SLR) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel David West re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel West. (ACC) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER: Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil USA, Inc., and Murphy Oil Corporation have moved for an order allowing David R. West, Esq., to appear pro hac vice in this case with Leonard H. Smith, Esq., designated as local counsel. The application of Mr. West appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS ORDERED: Murphy Defendant's #76 motion to allow Mr. West to appear on their behalf is GRANTED, subject to the following conditions: **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 7/6/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MOTION David R. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number MTX900016221.) Leonard H. Smith appearing for Cross Claimants Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Defendants Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David R. West, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Leonard) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Murphy Oil Defendants shall have up to and including November 9, 2020 to file their answer to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/1/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Leonard H. Smith appearing for Defendants Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Leonard) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Court's #4 Order, granting enlargement of time is hereby amended to grant Defendants Samson Resources Corp. and Samson Resources an enlargement of time until October 26, 2020 to serve a pleading responsive to, or a motion concerning, the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/31/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Robert L. Sterup appearing for Defendants Samson Resources Company, Samson Resources Corp Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Order Granting Extension of Time) (Sterup, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Samson Resources Company answer due 11/9/2020; Samson Resources Corp answer due 11/9/2020. (SLR) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Unopposed #3 Motion, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Samson Resources Corp. and Samson Resources are granted an enlargement of time until November 9, 2020 to serve a pleading responsive to, or a motion concerning, the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/26/2020. (SLR) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Robert L. Sterup appearing for Defendants Samson Resources Company, Samson Resources Corp Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time) (Sterup, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2517668 (MMS) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Samson Resources Company, Samson Resources Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Murphy Oil Corporation, #2 Summons - Murphy Oil USA, #3 Summons - Samson Resources Company, #4 Summons- Samson Resources Corp) (MMS) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Faith M. O'Connor, Dun O'Connor, Zimmerman, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons - Murphy Exploration, #3 Blank Summons - Murphy Oil Corporation, #4 Blank Summons Murphy Oil USA, #5 Blank Summons - Samson Resources Corp, #6 Blank Summons - Samson Resources Company) (MMS) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy Exploration & Production Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SAMSON RESOURCES CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where WR GRACE & CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmerman is a litigant