This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2020 at 10:34:54 (UTC).

Ziemer v. Smith & Nephew Inc

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 Ziemer filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Smith Nephew Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01485

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Weston Ray Ziemer

Defendant

Smith & Nephew Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David L Thomas

Attorney at Moore Taylor and Thomas (G)

23 Wade Hampton Boulevard

Greenville, SC 29609

H Asby Fulmer, III

Po Box 1330

Summerville, SC 29484

Defendant Attorney

James F Rogers

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Weston Ray Ziemer. Weston Ray Ziemer served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. (Fulmer, H) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#17

(#17) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/8/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/15/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#16

(#16) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/26/2021, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/29/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 4/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/15/2020. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 6/15/2020 (abuc). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#13

(#13) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Smith & Nephew Inc(Rogers, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Smith & Nephew Inc.(Rogers, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#11

(#11) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Smith & Nephew Inc.(Rogers, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Weston Ray Ziemer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fulmer, H) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/1/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/15/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/15/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/30/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/30/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/30/2020, Discovery due by 12/1/2020, Motions due by 12/15/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/29/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2021, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/12/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Smith & Nephew Inc. (abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Smith & Nephew Inc.(abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-06938. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9058613), filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Weston Ray Ziemer. Weston Ray Ziemer served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. (Fulmer, H) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/8/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/15/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/26/2021, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/29/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 4/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/15/2020. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 6/15/2020 (abuc). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#15) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 14 Reason: Filed in error. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 6/12/2020 Response due date modified to that of original filing: n/a (abuc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Smith & Nephew Inc(Rogers, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Smith & Nephew Inc.(Rogers, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Smith & Nephew Inc.(Rogers, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8 Reason: Filing attorney refiled corrected document instead of sending to the Clerk's Office to correct entry as directed. Corrected Filing Document Number #9 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 5/12/2020 Response due date modified to that of original filing: n/a (abuc) Modified to edit text on 5/12/2020 (abuc). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Weston Ray Ziemer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fulmer, H) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/1/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/15/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/15/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/30/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/30/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/30/2020, Discovery due by 12/1/2020, Motions due by 12/15/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/29/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2021, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/12/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff was directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 5/1/2020. To date, they have not been filed. Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories immediately. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 5/12/2020 (abuc). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 5/1/2020.(abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Smith & Nephew Inc. (abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Smith & Nephew Inc.(abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-06938. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9058613), filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less