This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:23:04 (UTC).

Ziccarello v. Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 Ziccarello filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Sanyo Energy U S A Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01995

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Ziccarello

Defendants

Panasonic Corporation of North America

Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation

Sanyo North America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Birka-White

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Steven Todd Knuppel

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven T. Knuppel

178 East Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Russell E Taylor

Attorney at FARELLA BRAUN MARTEL LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 21St Fl., Russ Building

San Francisco, CA 94104

John D Green

Attorney at Farella Braun + Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Charles E. Schaffer

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorneys

David Ramraj Singh

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

David L. Yohai

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal, & Manges, LLP`

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#28

(#28) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#27

(#27) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #26 Stipulation Scheduling Order as Amended Regarding Plaintiff Filing an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike, Stay, or Dismiss and Defendants' Reply Thereto. Motion hearing currently scheduled for 8/29/2019 and cmc currently scheduled for 8/1/2019 are continued pending a ruling on the Dickerts Motion and shall be reset at an appropriate time. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#26

(#26) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Plaintiff Filing Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike, Stay or Dismiss and Defendants' Reply Thereto filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Ramraj Singh Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John A. Stratford (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#24

(#24) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #23 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Deadlines re: #21 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's opposition due 7/10/2019; defendants' reply due 8/15/2019; hearing set 8/29/2019 at 1:30 p.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Taylor, Russell) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION to Strike or Stay, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, Stay, or Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/13/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#9

(#9) JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation and Richard Ziccarello. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Ziccarello.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/16/2019) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13258531.). Filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #26 Stipulation Scheduling Order as Amended Regarding Plaintiff Filing an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike, Stay, or Dismiss and Defendants' Reply Thereto. Motion hearing currently scheduled for 8/29/2019 and cmc currently scheduled for 8/1/2019 are continued pending a ruling on the Dickerts Motion and shall be reset at an appropriate time. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Plaintiff Filing Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike, Stay or Dismiss and Defendants' Reply Thereto filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Ramraj Singh Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John A. Stratford (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Strike or Stay MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 7/10/2019. Replies due by 8/15/2019. Motion Hearing reset for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #23 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Deadlines re: #21 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's opposition due 7/10/2019; defendants' reply due 8/15/2019; hearing set 8/29/2019 at 1:30 p.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Taylor, Russell) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Declaration in Support of #21 MOTION to Strike or Stay, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Strike or Stay, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, Stay, or Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/13/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEFENDANTS' DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(A) and Civil Local Rule 3-15 by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation, Corporate Parent Panasonic Holding (Netherlands) B.V. for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation and Richard Ziccarello. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Ziccarello.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/16/2019) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13258531.). Filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Panasonic Corporation of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Green

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Birka-White