This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2020 at 22:59:44 (UTC).

ZICCARELLO v. SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 ZICCARELLO filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against SANYO ENERGY U S A CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-16623

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Ziccarello

Defendants

PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA

Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation

SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

DOES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ

Attorney at LEVIN SEDRAN & BERMAN LLP

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorneys

LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK

Attorney at SILLS CUMMIS & GROSS P.C.

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102

DAVID L. YOHAI

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL & MANGES, LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

RICHARD H. EPSTEIN

Attorney at SILLS CUMMIS & GROSS PC

One Riverfront Plaza, 12Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying briefing schedule for motion to dismiss; Plaintiff will file his Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 2/4/2020; Defendants will file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 2/28/2020; Motion day for the Motion to Dismiss will be 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/26/2019. (lag, ) Modified on 12/26/2019 (ek). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#59

(#59) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Modifying Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by RICHARD ZICCARELLO. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

58 #13

Exhibit 10

58 #12

Exhibit 9

58 #6

Exhibit 3

58 #4

Exhibit 1

58 #3

Declaration of David L. Yohai

58 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#58

(#58) MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of David L. Yohai, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation and Richard Ziccarello. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Ziccarello.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/16/2019) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13258531.). Filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying briefing schedule for motion to dismiss; Plaintiff will file his Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 2/4/2020; Defendants will file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 2/28/2020; Motion day for the Motion to Dismiss will be 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/26/2019. (lag, ) Modified on 12/26/2019 (ek). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Modifying Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by RICHARD ZICCARELLO. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #58 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of David L. Yohai, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Certification on behalf of PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) AMENDED COMPLAINT against PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, filed by RICHARD ZICCARELLO.(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVEN T. KNUPPEL and DAVID M. BIRKA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David M. Birka-White to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven T. Knuppel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEFENDANTS' DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(A) and Civil Local Rule 3-15 by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation, Corporate Parent Panasonic Holding (Netherlands) B.V. for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation and Richard Ziccarello. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Ziccarello.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/16/2019) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13258531.). Filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Panasonic Corporation of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael M. Weinkowitz